This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 09:28:23 (UTC).

Semaan v. Mayorkas et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Semaan filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Gregory J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00559

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fadi Toufic Semaan

Defendants

Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Stoller

Attorney at Law Offices of David Stoller, PA

4445 S Conway Rd

Orlando, FL 32812-0073

Defendant Attorney

Lakisha Davis

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

400 W. Washington St, Suite 3100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/24/2022. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 5/10/2022. (Baker, David) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Davis, Lakisha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Fadi Toufic Semaan. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of service)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Fadi Toufic Semaan. Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 3/30/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified on 5/2/2022 (KNC). (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed by Fadi Toufic Semaan. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified on 5/2/2022 (KNC). (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/24/2022. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/24/2022. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (BD) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-0559-WWB-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19351825) filed by Fadi Toufic Semaan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Form N-400 Receipt, #5 Exhibit Web Portal information, #6 Exhibit Interview Notice, #7 Exhibit Current Processing Times, #8 Exhibit Historical Processing Times, #9 Exhibit How to Read Processing times)(Stoller, David) Modified on 3/17/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant