This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:22:14 (UTC).

Seltzer v. National General Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Seltzer filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against National General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Taylor Swain and Sarah Netburn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11176

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Taylor Swain

Referral Judge

Sarah Netburn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Seltzer

Defendants

NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

5620 University Parkway, Winston-Salem

New York, NC 27102

National General Holding Corp.

Matthew Roe

Roe and Associates

2 Hanover Square, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10004

National General Holdings Corp.

Matthew J. Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Jerome Rozger

Attorney at Beranbaum Menken Ben- Asher & Bierman LLP

80 Pine Street- 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Thelma Akpan

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (NYC)

900 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

A Michael Weber

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (NYC)

900 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#1

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National General Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew J. Roe, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National General Holdings Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roe and Associates, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National General Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. Document filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company, Matthew J. Roe, Roe and Associates.(Weber, A) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION: This action and all deadlines are stayed for 90 days. In light of the parties' agreement to proceed to arbitration, the motion filed at ECF 16 is denied without prejudice. The parties shall file a joint letter by April 29, 2020, regarding the status of the case. (Motions terminated: #16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration, filed by Roe and Associates, National General Insurance Company, National General Holdings Corp., Matthew J. Roe.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2020) (ras) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#22

(#22) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER: No later than January 27, 2020, Plaintiff shall file either an opposition to Defendants' motion or a status letter stating whether he intends to oppose. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/23/2020) (ras) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/21/2020) (ama) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#19

(#19) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Matthew J. Roe served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Managing Agent. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

18 #7

Exhibit G - 2012 to 2015 Acknowledgments

18 #6

Exhibit F - 2015 Agreement

18 #3

Exhibit C - 2012 Agreement

18 #2

Exhibit B - 2011 Acknowledgment

18 #5

Exhibit E - 2014 Agreement

18 #4

Exhibit D - 2013 Agreement

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION: This action and all deadlines are stayed for 90 days. In light of the parties' agreement to proceed to arbitration, the motion filed at ECF 16 is denied without prejudice. The parties shall file a joint letter by April 29, 2020, regarding the status of the case. (Motions terminated: #16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration, filed by Roe and Associates, National General Insurance Company, National General Holdings Corp., Matthew J. Roe.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2020) (ras) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: No later than January 27, 2020, Plaintiff shall file either an opposition to Defendants' motion or a status letter stating whether he intends to oppose. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/23/2020) (ras) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/21/2020) (ama) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Matthew J. Roe served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Managing Agent. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of A. Michael Weber in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration.. Document filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company, Matthew J. Roe, Roe and Associates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2011 Policy Communication, #2 Exhibit B - 2011 Acknowledgment, #3 Exhibit C - 2012 Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - 2013 Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - 2014 Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - 2015 Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - 2012 to 2015 Acknowledgments)(Weber, A) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. . Document filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company, Matthew J. Roe, Roe and Associates. (Weber, A) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. Document filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company, Matthew J. Roe, Roe and Associates.(Weber, A) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thelma Akpan on behalf of National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company, Matthew J. Roe, Roe and Associates. (Akpan, Thelma) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by A Michael Weber on behalf of National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company, Matthew J. Roe, Roe and Associates. (Weber, A) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National General Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roe and Associates, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National General Holdings Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew J. Roe, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Seltzer. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jason Jerome Rozger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, National General Holding Corp., Matthew Roe, Roe and Associates. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, National General Holding Corp., Matthew Roe, Roe and Associates. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-18224318)Document filed by Michael Seltzer.(Rozger, Jason) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.