This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2023 at 07:33:04 (UTC).

Sellers v. Home Depot Product Authority LLC

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 Sellers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot Product Authority LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alexander C Ekstrom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-05133

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alexander C Ekstrom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Penny Jean Sellers

Defendant

Home Depot Product Authority LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jarrod Hays

Defendant Attorneys

Kaytlin L Carlson

Kelsey Lynn Shewbert

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Kelsey L. Shewbert re #1 Notice of Removal by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Defendant Home Depot Product Authority's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC.(Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 11/18/2022 (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#7

(#7) First MOTION to Remand by Penny Jean Sellers. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2022 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (Hays, Jarrod) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Plaintiffs Order Remanding

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING #7 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs is DENIED. Case remanded to the Superior Court of Benton County, Washington. Case is Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #7 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs is DENIED. Case remanded to the Superior Court of Benton County, Washington. Case is Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) REPLY MEMORANDUM re #7 First MOTION to Remand filed by Penny Jean Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiffs Order Remanding)(Hays, Jarrod) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 First MOTION to Remand filed by Home Depot Product Authority LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) First MOTION to Remand by Penny Jean Sellers. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2022 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (Hays, Jarrod) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 11/18/2022 (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Defendant Home Depot Product Authority's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC.(Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Kelsey L. Shewbert re #1 Notice of Removal by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-4156575 Filed by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shewbert, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less