This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2020 at 09:15:12 (UTC).

Sellers v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Sellers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are P. Bradley Murray, William E. Cassady and Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Judges

P. Bradley Murray

William E. Cassady

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lashundra Monice Sellers

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Albertus F. Wiesedeppe

Attorney at Nations Law Firm

9703 Richmond Ave., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042-4863

Gary L. Fuller

Attorney at Nations Law Firm

9703 Richmond Ave., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042-4863

Howard L. Nations

Attorney at Howard L. Nations, P.C.

9703 Richmond Ave., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Jackson Eric Knouse

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

William H. Morrow

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Harlan I. Prater, IV

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re: #14 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lashundra Monice Sellers. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 6/3/20. (cmj) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company, and by Lashundra Monice Sellers. (Nations, Howard) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Eric Knouse on behalf of All Defendants (Knouse, Jackson) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of All Defendants (Morrow, William) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Prater, Harlan) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12983. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#7

(#7) IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the UnitedStates District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/7/2020. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that no later than MARCH 5, 2020, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than APRIL 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/4/2020.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7890758) filed by Lashundra Monice Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Lashundra Monice Sellers(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2019)

#10

(#10) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. (skb) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

9 #3

Authorization

9 #2

HIPAA Protective Order

9 #1

Protective Order

#9

(#9) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re: #14 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lashundra Monice Sellers. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 6/3/20. (cmj) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #14 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company, and by Lashundra Monice Sellers. (Nations, Howard) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Eric Knouse on behalf of All Defendants (Knouse, Jackson) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of All Defendants (Morrow, William) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Prater, Harlan) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. (skb) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Howard L. Nations. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 1:19-cv-00169. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2598581, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Nations, Howard) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12983. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the UnitedStates District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/7/2020. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that no later than MARCH 5, 2020, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than APRIL 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/4/2020.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7890758) filed by Lashundra Monice Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Lashundra Monice Sellers(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albertus F. Wiesedeppe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary L. Fuller