This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 07:42:18 (UTC).

Sellars vs. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Sellars filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06460

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brent Sellars

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory T. Phillips

Attorney at Segar & Sciortino

400 Meridian Centre, Suite 320

Rochester, NY 14618

Defendant Attorney

Jean Marie Del Colliano

Attorney at Social Security Administration

26 Federal Plaza, Room 3904

New York, NY 10278

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Del Colliano on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Del Colliano, Jean Marie) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore his motion (Docket # 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiffs papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/17/19. (NNR) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Social Security Administration, US Attorney's Office and US Attorney General on 7/17/19, filed by Brent Sellars. (Phillips, Gregory) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New Yorks Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 complaint)(TF) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brent Sellars.(Phillips, Gregory) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-Filing Notification: #1 COMPLAINT - you must pay a filing fee by personal check, money order, certified check, or official check made out to "Clerk, United States District Court". The fee schedule can be located on our public web site or provided to you by a member of the Clerks Office. You may also file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (as a poor person); if you qualify, you will not be required to pay the filing fee. (TF) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool (TF) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Brent Sellars, filed by Brent Sellars. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Phillips, Gregory) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less