This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 13:02:06 (UTC).

SELGRIL S.A. v. M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 SELGRIL S A filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12072

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELGRIL S.A.

Defendant

M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH GERARD FALCONE

Attorney at HERBERT SMITH FREEHILLS NEW YORK, LLP

450 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorney

TIMOTHY JAMES NAST

Attorney at TISDALE LAW OFFICES LLC

60 East 42Nd Street, Ste 1638

New York, NY 10165

 

Court Documents

#1

(#10) Exhibit to #1 Complaint Exhibits A & B by SELGRIL S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELGRIL S.A. as to M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by SELGRIL S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#4

(#8) Exhibit to #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem re: Warrant by SELGRIL S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support filed by SELGRIL S.A. re #4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#6

(#6) Exhibit to #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem re: Proposed Order for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by SELGRIL S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION to Allow Vessel Movement to Conduct Repairs and Move Within the District by SELGRIL S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#8

(#8) Exhibit to #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem re: Warrant by SELGRIL S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#27

(#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed by M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem. M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (sm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#25

(#25) STIPULATION extending time to respond to Complaint by M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem. (NAST, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#26

(#26) ORDER that Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended up to an including 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/10/2019. (sm) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

11 #2

Certification Peter J. Behmke

11 #1

Certification of Joseph G. Falcone

11 #4

Proposed Order

11 #3

Certificate of Good Standing

12 #4

Proposed Order

#11

(#24) ORDER granting #11 and #12 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Peter J. Behmke, Esq. and Michael P. Jones; counsel shall make payments to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection and shall each pay $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/21/2019. (sm) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • (#28) TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 is adjourned to 8/6/2019 at 3:30 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 8/2/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/3/2019. (jqb, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed by M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem. M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (sm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #25 submitted by M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/8/2019. (sm) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER that Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended up to an including 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/10/2019. (sm) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) STIPULATION extending time to respond to Complaint by M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem. (NAST, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to Peter J. Behmke, Esq. and Michael P. Jones, Esq., receipt number TRE102748. (jem) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting #11 and #12 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Peter J. Behmke, Esq. and Michael P. Jones; counsel shall make payments to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection and shall each pay $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/21/2019. (sm) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#23) TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 7/23/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/20/2019. (jqb, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STATEMENT of Interest in the Vessel (Verified) by M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem. (NAST, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Exhibit to #1 Complaint Exhibits A & B by SELGRIL S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SELGRIL S.A. identifying Selgril S.A. as Corporate Parent.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Exhibit to #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem re: Warrant by SELGRIL S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Allow Vessel Movement to Conduct Repairs and Move Within the District by SELGRIL S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Exhibit to #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem re: Proposed Order for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by SELGRIL S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in Support filed by SELGRIL S.A. re #4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by SELGRIL S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by SELGRIL S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELGRIL S.A. as to M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem. (FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9635864), filed by SELGRIL S.A..(FALCONE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less