This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 07:46:40 (UTC).

Self et al v. 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co) et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Self filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00480

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Martin Self

Destry Sharp

James Shea

James Shelton

Randy Simon

Ernest Smith

Larry Stamper

Gerard Talmadge

Bernal Thompson

Reginald W. Turner

Winston Varnado

James Vickery

Peter Voisin

Timothy Wanke

Robert Way

Dixie White

Dolores White

Roy Wiliiams

Gary J Willard Jr.

Mary Williams

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Jordan David Sagalowsky

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10020-1001

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. 1. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, April 1, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences, as further set forth. 6. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)'counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov.The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981 SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Initial Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/26/2022) (mml) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/31/2022) (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketReceived e-mail from the United States District Court - District of South Carolina acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:22-cv-00307, filed on 01/31/2022. (sjo) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/31/2022) (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. 1. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, April 1, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences, as further set forth. 6. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)'counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov.The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981 SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Initial Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/26/2022) (mml) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 161611/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25604497).Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint).(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan David Sagalowsky