This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 08:09:18 (UTC).

SELENE FINANCE LP v. CAMPO, ESQ

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 SELENE FINANCE LP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CAMPO, ESQ. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are KAREN FRINK WOLF and JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00209

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KAREN FRINK WOLF

Presiding Judge

JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELENE FINANCE LP

Defendant

BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 303C

Beverly, MA 01915

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN P. CAMPO, JR.

Attorney at DOUGLAS MCDANIEL & CAMPO, LLC, P.A.

90 Bridge Street, Suite 100

Westbrook, ME 04092

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit A - Property Description

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit Consent Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/27/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/3/2023. Motions due by 1/17/2023. Ready for Trial on 3/6/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lrt) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#6

(#6) Defendant Special Administrator's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ.(CAMPO, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SELENE FINANCE LP. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#4

(#4) AGREEMENT of Acceptance of Service by SELENE FINANCE LP (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

1 #7

Exhibit G-Inspection Report

1 #6

Exhibit F-Assignment into Selene Finance, LP

1 #5

Exhibit E-Quitclaim Assignment into BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP

1 #4

Exhibit D-Assignment into BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP

1 #3

Exhibit C-Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B-Note

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property Description)(tcs) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Judgment by SELENE FINANCE LP Responses due by 9/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale)(LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/27/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/3/2023. Motions due by 1/17/2023. Ready for Trial on 3/6/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lrt) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant Special Administrator's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ.(CAMPO, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ: Answer due by 8/4/2022. (tcs) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SELENE FINANCE LP. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AGREEMENT of Acceptance of Service by SELENE FINANCE LP (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2674371.), filed by SELENE FINANCE LP.(LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to SELENE FINANCE LP: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/18/2022. (clp) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. filed by SELENE FINANCE LP. (Service of Process Deadline 10/11/2022) Fee due by 7/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B-Note, #3 Exhibit C-Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D-Assignment into BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, #5 Exhibit E-Quitclaim Assignment into BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, #6 Exhibit F-Assignment into Selene Finance, LP, #7 Exhibit G-Inspection Report)(clp) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELENE FINANCE, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENJAMIN P. CAMPO, JR.