This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:23:36 (UTC).

Selective Insurance Company of America v. Panorama Hotels, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Selective Insurance Company of America filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Panorama Hotels, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Clarence Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05500

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clarence Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Selective Insurance Company of America

Defendant

Panorama Hotels, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DeWitte Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at Thompson & Slagle, LLC

Suite 355, 3325 Paddocks Parkway

Suwanee, GA 30024

Defendant Attorney

Lynn C. Stewart

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

Suite 800, 1100 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4516

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Selective Insurance Company of America (Thompson, DeWitte) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Panorama Hotels, LLC's Answer due 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 1/31/20. (bjh) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2: Performance Bond

2 #1

Exhibit 1: Contract between Defendant and Sharpe Contractors, LLC

#5

(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Panorama Hotels, LLC. (bjh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn C. Stewart on behalf of Panorama Hotels, LLC (Stewart, Lynn) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Panorama Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, Lynn) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Selective Insurance Company of America re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Contract between Defendant and Sharpe Contractors, LLC, #2 Exhibit 2: Performance Bond)(Herrin, Kelley) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. (SIGI) for Selective Insurance Company of America by Selective Insurance Company of America.(Thompson, DeWitte) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Selective Insurance Company of Americ (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9154839). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Panorama Hotels, LLC. Panorama Hotels, LLC waiver mailed on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (Stewart, Lynn) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Panorama Hotels, LLC's Answer due 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 1/31/20. (bjh) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Panorama Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, Lynn) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Panorama Hotels, LLC. Panorama Hotels, LLC waiver mailed on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (Stewart, Lynn) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn C. Stewart on behalf of Panorama Hotels, LLC (Stewart, Lynn) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Panorama Hotels, LLC. (bjh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. (SIGI) for Selective Insurance Company of America by Selective Insurance Company of America.(Thompson, DeWitte) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Selective Insurance Company of America (Thompson, DeWitte) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Selective Insurance Company of America re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Contract between Defendant and Sharpe Contractors, LLC, #2 Exhibit 2: Performance Bond)(Herrin, Kelley) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Selective Insurance Company of Americ (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9154839). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.