This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:51:24 (UTC).

SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA v. ELAN ENERGY PARTNERS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELAN ENERGY PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Jose R. Almonte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02590

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Jose R. Almonte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Defendants

Elan Energy Partners LLC d/b/a Elan Renewables

12445 55Th Avenue N, Suite A

Lake Elmo, MN 55042

Mola Properties, Inc.

4002 Brookdale Ct

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Adam Trevillian

Montgomery, TX 77316

Valerie Trevillian

Montgomery, TX 77316

Ali Aziz

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Jalis Dhuka

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Moez Dhuka

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Laila Dhuka

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Sean Zarbinski

Forest Lake, MN 55045

Michelle Zarbinski

Forest Lake, MN 55045

ELAN ENERGY PARTNERS LLC doing business as ELAN RENEWABLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADAM RAFE SCHWARTZ

Attorney at MCELROY, DEUTSCH, MULVANEY & CARPENTER, LLP

1300 Mount Kemble Avenue

Morristown, NJ 07962-2075

MICHAEL CHRISTIAN DELANEY

Attorney at MCELROY, DEUTSCH, MULVANEY & CARPENTER, LLP

1300 Mount Kemble Avenue, Po Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962

Defendant Attorney

GREG K. VITALI

Attorney at LINDABURY, MCCORMICK & ESTABOOK, PC

53 Cardinal Drive, Po Box 2369

Westfield, NJ 07091-2369

 

Court Documents

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELAN ENERGY PARTNERS LLC identifying AJA Alliance LLC as Corporate Parent.. (VITALI, GREG) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#18

(#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MOLA PROPERTIES, INC. identifying No corporate parent as Corporate Parent.. (VITALI, GREG) Modified on 6/22/2022 to reflect filing is for Mola Properties, Inc. ONLY. (eaj, ). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

17 #1

Certification Application for Extension of Time

17 #17

Main Document

16 #5

Affidavit Affidavit of Service Valerie Trevillian

16 #3

Affidavit Affidavit of Service Moez Dhuka

16 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service Jalis Dhuka

16 #16

Main Document

#8

(#8) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Moez Dhuka. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#7

(#7) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Laila Dhuka. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#6

(#6) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Jalis Dhuka. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Elan Energy Partners LLC d/b/a Elan Renewables. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Adam Trevillian. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Ali Aziz. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Selective Insurance Group, Inc.; as Corporate Parent.. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit General Indemnity Agreement

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA has restricted access to the NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed on 6/24/2022 without an order or clarification as to why access was restricted. Please submit a certification stating that this document is to be marked Confidential Material or that this document's access was restricted in error. Please be advised, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3, you must file a motion for leave to have a document sealed. (mxw, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM RAFE SCHWARTZ on behalf of SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (SCHWARTZ, ADAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELAN ENERGY PARTNERS LLC identifying AJA Alliance LLC as Corporate Parent.. (VITALI, GREG) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MOLA PROPERTIES, INC. identifying No corporate parent as Corporate Parent.. (VITALI, GREG) Modified on 6/22/2022 to reflect filing is for Mola Properties, Inc. ONLY. (eaj, ). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint by ALI AZIZ, JALIS DHUKA, LAILA DHUKA, MOEZ DHUKA, ELAN ENERGY PARTNERS LLC, MOLA PROPERTIES, INC., ADAM TREVILLIAN, VALERIE TREVILLIAN. (Attachments: #1 Certification Application for Extension of Time)(VITALI, GREG) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT Of Service Adam Trevillian by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Jalis Dhuka, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Laila Dhuka, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Moez Dhuka, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Mola Properties, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Valerie Trevillian)(SCHWARTZ, ADAM) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Exhibit to #1 Complaint with Revised Electronic Signature by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALI AZIZ, JALIS DHUKA, LAILA DHUKA, MOEZ DHUKA, ELAN ENERGY PARTNERS LLC, MOLA PROPERTIES, INC., ADAM TREVILLIAN, VALERIE TREVILLIAN, MICHELLE ZARBINSKI, SEAN ZARBINSKI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1 COMPLAINT submitted by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA on 5/2/2022 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE using the event "Exhibit (To Document)" found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mxw, ) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption, Party Information . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. For future reference, please ensure all parties are capitalized. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mxw) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Michelle Zarbinski. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Moez Dhuka. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Laila Dhuka. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Jalis Dhuka. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Elan Energy Partners LLC d/b/a Elan Renewables. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Adam Trevillian. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Summons to be Issued by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as to Ali Aziz. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Selective Insurance Group, Inc.; as Corporate Parent.. (DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13381182), filed by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit General Indemnity Agreement)(DELANEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant