This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:34:28 (UTC).

Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. v. Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04171

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.

Defendants

Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.

South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc.

South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc. a South Dakota corporation doing business as Dakotacare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brett A. Lovrien

Attorney at Cadwell, Sanford, Deibert & Garry, LLP

200 E 10Th Street, Suite 200, 336-0828, Fax: 336-6036

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey T. Sveen

Attorney at Siegel, Barnett & Schutz, L.L.P.

415 South Main Street

Aberdeen, SD 57401

Reed A. Rasmussen

Attorney at Siegel, Barnett & Schutz

Po Box 490, 225-5420, Fax: 226-1911

Aberdeen, SD 57402-0490

Roger A. Sudbeck

Attorney at Boyce Law Firm, LLP

300 South Main Avenue, Po Box 5015

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/12/2019. (SAC) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.. (Rasmussen, Reed) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#12

(#12) Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc.. (Sudbeck, Roger) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Sudbeck on behalf of South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc.. (Sudbeck, Roger) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. (Lovrien, Brett) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (SAC) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#8

(#8) (FILED IN ERROR) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc., Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Lovrien, Brett) Modified on 10/16/2019 (CLR). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. (Lovrien, Brett) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Sveen on behalf of Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.. (Sveen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Reed A. Rasmussen on behalf of Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.. (Rasmussen, Reed) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Lovrien, Brett) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. of Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Service of Summons. (Lovrien, Brett) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

2 #2

AO 85

2 #1

Summons Issued

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc., South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc. 2 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3163316) filed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. in shell case on 9/30/2019. (CLR) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/12/2019. (SAC) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.. (Rasmussen, Reed) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc.. (Sudbeck, Roger) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Sudbeck on behalf of South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc.. (Sudbeck, Roger) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. (Lovrien, Brett) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Filing Error: #8 Waiver of Service Executed was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Lovrien, Brett) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (SAC) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) (FILED IN ERROR) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc., Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Lovrien, Brett) Modified on 10/16/2019 (CLR). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. (Lovrien, Brett) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Sveen on behalf of Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.. (Sveen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Reed A. Rasmussen on behalf of Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.. (Rasmussen, Reed) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Lovrien, Brett) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. of Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Service of Summons. (Lovrien, Brett) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc., South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc. 2 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3163316) filed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. in shell case on 9/30/2019. (CLR) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less