This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2023 at 07:27:24 (UTC).

Selden v. Trans Union, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Selden filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Trans Union, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melinda Selden

Defendants

Trans Union, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Service, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dale Wood Pittman

Attorney at The Law Office of Dale W. Pittman, P.C.

112-A W Tabb St

Petersburg, VA 23803-3212

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

James Patrick McNichol

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Defendant Attorneys

Gibson Sinclair Wright

Attorney at McCandlish Holton PC

1111 E Main St, Suite 2100

Richmond, VA 23218-0796

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

John Willard Montgomery, Jr.

Attorney at Traylor Montgomery & Elliott PC

130 E Wythe St

Petersburg, VA 23803

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDERED that the Motions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants have until March 27, 2023 to file their responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint in re #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/24/2023. (swil) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#14

(#14) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

13 #1

Agreed Order

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Agreed Order)(Anthony, David) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#12

(#12) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC has until March 27, 2023 to file its responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint in re #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/6/2023. (swil) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#9

(#9) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Equifax Information Service, LLC. (Montgomery, John) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Shannon Nash on behalf of Melinda Selden (Nash, Casey) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick McNichol on behalf of Melinda Selden (McNichol, James) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Guzzo on behalf of Melinda Selden (Guzzo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Wood Pittman on behalf of Melinda Selden (Pittman, Dale) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Service, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8754330.), filed by Melinda Selden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDERED that the Motions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants have until March 27, 2023 to file their responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint in re #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/24/2023. (swil) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Agreed Order)(Anthony, David) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC has until March 27, 2023 to file its responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint in re #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/6/2023. (swil) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Equifax Information Service, LLC. (Montgomery, John) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Shannon Nash on behalf of Melinda Selden (Nash, Casey) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick McNichol on behalf of Melinda Selden (McNichol, James) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Guzzo on behalf of Melinda Selden (Guzzo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Wood Pittman on behalf of Melinda Selden (Pittman, Dale) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Service, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Melinda Selden. (Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8754330.), filed by Melinda Selden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less