This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:02:00 (UTC).

SELAK v. CREDIT CONTROL, LLC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SELAK filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against CREDIT CONTROL, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew P. Brookman and James Patrick Hanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04833

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZANNA SELAK

Defendant

CREDIT CONTROL, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard John Shea, Jr.

Attorney at SAWIN & SHEA, LLC

6100 North Keystone Ave., Suite 620

Indianapolis, IN 46220

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF A PLEADING AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. All that remains to be done is the execution of documents and/or delivery of funds, if so required, in accordance with their agreement. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal and submit an order for the Courts signature ordering the dismissal of this action. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/21/2020.(JRB) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Case

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Proof of Claim

1 #9

Proposed Summons

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ZANNA SELAK. CREDIT CONTROL, LLC. waiver sent on 12/27/2019. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - August 26, 2019, Dunning Letter

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to CREDIT CONTROL, LLC. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Order on Motion for Relief from Order

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - USPS Tracking Information

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Motion for Relief from Order

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CREDIT CONTROL, LLC., filed by ZANNA SELAK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756716) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Claim, #4 Exhibit 4 - Motion for Relief from Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order on Motion for Relief from Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - August 26, 2019, Dunning Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - USPS Tracking Information, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff ZANNA SELAK. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF A PLEADING AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. All that remains to be done is the execution of documents and/or delivery of funds, if so required, in accordance with their agreement. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal and submit an order for the Courts signature ordering the dismissal of this action. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/21/2020.(JRB) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ZANNA SELAK. CREDIT CONTROL, LLC. waiver sent on 12/27/2019. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to CREDIT CONTROL, LLC. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff ZANNA SELAK. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CREDIT CONTROL, LLC., filed by ZANNA SELAK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756716) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Claim, #4 Exhibit 4 - Motion for Relief from Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order on Motion for Relief from Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - August 26, 2019, Dunning Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - USPS Tracking Information, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less