This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 07:41:48 (UTC).

SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West v. Santa Rosa Community Health Centers

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Santa Rosa Community Health Centers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03261

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West

Respondent

Santa Rosa Community Health Centers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

William T Hanley

Bruce A. Harland

Respondent Attorneys

Charles Painter

Rebecca L Menendez

 

Court Documents

14 #4

[Proposed] Order Compelling Arbitration

14 #3

Declaration of William T. Hanley ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration

14 #2

Declaration of Mark Hall

14 #1

Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint bySanta Rosa Community Health Centers. (Painter, Charles) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#12

(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

11 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/8/2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Adva nced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than by noon on 9/7/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

9 #9

Main Document

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West.. (Hanley, William) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Santa Rosa Community Health Centers. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/30/202 2. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#4

(#4) ***DISREGARD. INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED BY CLERK.*** Summons Issued as to Santa Rosa Community Health Centers. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) Modified on 6/7/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Hanley, William) (Filed on 6/3/2022) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit D to Petition to Compel Arbitration

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MOTION HEARING. Due to the Court's unavailability, the hearing on Defendant's #14 Motion to Compel Arbitration is advanced to 8/31/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar. Pursuant to L.R. 7-7(d), the briefing schedule will remain the same. The initial case management conference set for 9/8/2022 is vacated and will be rescheduled upon the ruling on the Motion to Compel Arbitration.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required o f counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 8/30/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no doc ument associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 8/9/2022. Replies due by 8/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Mark Hall, #3 Declaration of William T. Hanley ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 [Proposed] Order Compelling Arbitration)(Hanley, William) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint bySanta Rosa Community Health Centers. (Painter, Charles) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West. Santa Rosa Community Health Centers served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hanley, William) (Filed on 6/13/2022) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/8/2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Adva nced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than by noon on 9/7/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West.. (Hanley, William) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Santa Rosa Community Health Centers. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/30/202 2. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ***DISREGARD. INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED BY CLERK.*** Summons Issued as to Santa Rosa Community Health Centers. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) Modified on 6/7/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022

Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/20/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Hanley, William) (Filed on 6/3/2022) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) PETITION to Compel Arbitration against Santa Rosa Community Health Centers with jury demand (filing fee $402, receipt number ACANDC-17235793). Filed by SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit B to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #3 Exhibit C to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #4 Exhibit D to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #5 Exhibit E to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #6 Exhibit F to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #7 Exhibit G to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #8 Exhibit H to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #9 Exhibit I to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #10 Exhibit J to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #11 Exhibit K to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #12 Exhibit L to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #13 Exhibit M to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Notice of Related Cases)(Hanley, William) (Filed on 6/3/2022) Modified on 6/7/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less