This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:24:27 (UTC).

Seitz v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Seitz filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against International Brotherhood of Teamsters. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alex G. Tse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05346

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alex G. Tse

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James E Seitz

Fremont, CA 94555

James Edward Seitz

Fremont, CA 94555

Defendants

International Brotherhood of Teamsters

Teamsters Local 986

Chris Griswold

United Airlines

United Airlines Technical Operations SFO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Susan K. Garea

Attorney at Beeson, Tayer & Bodine, APC

492 Ninth Street, Suite 350

Oakland, CA 94607

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Receipt

1 #5

Letter

1 #6

Envelope

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Declaration Declaration of James E Seitz

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT 3:21-cv-05346-AGT against All Defendants. Filed byJames Edward Seitz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James E Seitz)(Seitz, James) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Service waived by International Brotherhood of Teamsters waiver sent on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Garea, Susan) (Filed on 8/23/2021) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Teamsters Local 986. Service waived by Teamsters Local 986 waiver sent on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Garea, Susan) (Filed on 8/23/2021) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Chris Griswold. Service waived by Chris Griswold waiver sent on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Garea, Susan) (Filed on 8/23/2021) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Edward Seitz.. (Seitz, James) (Filed on 7/26/2021) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Chris Griswold, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Teamsters Local 986, United Airlines, United Airlines Technical Operations SFO. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chris Griswold, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Teamsters Local 986, United Airlines, United Airlines Technical Operations SFO (Filing fee $ 402.). Filed byJames E Seitz. Consent/Declination due by 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt, #5 Letter, #6 Envelope)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Brotherhood of Teamsters is a litigant

Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant