This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2021 at 10:56:13 (UTC).

Seidman v. Backchina, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Seidman filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Backchina, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Helayne Seidman

Defendant

Backchina, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Paul Liebowitz

Attorney at District Court Information

11 Sunrise Plaza, Ste 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Craig B Sanders

Attorney at Barshay Sanders, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Ste 500

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Declaration

1 #4

Notice

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Attachments

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Backchina, LLC served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021, filed.(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Backchina, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Backchina, LLC, filed.(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig B. Sanders on behalf of Helayne Seidman, filed. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (RuthGuerreroadi, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons Not Issued as to Backchina, LLC due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintiff not present. Blank Summons. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Backchina, LLC, filed.(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Backchina, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25794902) filed by Helayne Seidman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration, #4 Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BackChina, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig B. Sanders

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Paul Liebowitz