This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2022 at 07:34:21 (UTC).

Segura v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Segura filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly L. Teeter and Teresa J. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01109

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly L. Teeter

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fernanda Segura

Defendant

Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Corey Sucher

Attorney at DeVaughn James Injury Lawyers

3241 North Toben Street

Wichita, KS 67226

John Hadley Sizemore

Attorney at Bull Attorneys, PA

10111 E. 21St Street N, Suite 204

Wichita, KS 67206

Defendant Attorneys

Brette S. Hart

Attorney at Harris & Hart, LLC

9260 Glenwood Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

Matthew W. Greenberg

Attorney at Harris & Hart, LLC

9260 Glenwood Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

James Patrick Maloney

Attorney at Foland, Wickens, Roper, Hofer & Crawford, PC

1200 Main Street, Suite 2200

Kansas City, MO 64105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Maloney, James) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Fernanda Segura. (Sucher, John) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A - Commissioner's Proof of Service

#4

(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew W. Greenberg on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Greenberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#5

(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brette S. Hart on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Hart, Brette) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#6

(#6) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Hart, Brette) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company.(Hart, Brette) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 6/27/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order deadline 7/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/6/2022. (ts) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Maloney, James) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Maloney, James) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Maloney, James) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#12

(#12) AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Maloney, James) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#14

(#14) WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by J. Corey Sucher and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTED COUNSEL by John Hadley Sizemore on behalf of Fernanda Segura (Sizemore, John) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#15

(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company identifying Progressive Corporation as corporate parent (Greenberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Fernanda Segura. (Sizemore, John) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Greenberg, Matthew) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Greenberg, Matthew) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Fernanda Segura. (Sizemore, John) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#16) ORDER - The Scheduling Conference is now set for 7/20/2022 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/28/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company identifying Progressive Corporation as corporate parent (Greenberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by J. Corey Sucher and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTED COUNSEL by John Hadley Sizemore on behalf of Fernanda Segura (Sizemore, John) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER denying as moot #9 Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant had earlier filed its responsive pleading through other counsel (ECF No. 7). Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/13/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Maloney, James) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Maloney, James) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Maloney, James) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Maloney, James) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 6/27/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order deadline 7/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/6/2022. (ts) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company.(Hart, Brette) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Hart, Brette) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brette S. Hart on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Hart, Brette) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew W. Greenberg on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Greenberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Fernanda Segura upon Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Commissioner's Proof of Service)(Sucher, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Fernanda Segura. (Sucher, John) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5779105.), filed by Fernanda Segura.(Sucher, John) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James P. Maloney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brette S. Hart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew William Greenberg