This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2022 at 06:27:16 (UTC).

Segura v. Geico County Mutual Insurance Co et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Segura filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico County Mutual Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Carol B Whitehurst. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01071

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Demi A. Segura

Demi A Segura

Defendants

Geico

Geico County Mutual Insurance Co

Harry Brown, Jr

Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Anthony Matt

Attorney at Law Offices of Matt & Allen

P O Box 4405

Lafayette, LA 70502

Miles A Matt

Attorney at Law Offices of Matt & Allen

P O Box 4405

Lafayette, LA 70502

Defendant Attorneys

James J Young, IV

Attorney at Barry & Co (NO)

612 Gravier St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Daphne P McNutt

Attorney at Barry & Co (NO)

612 Gravier St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephen R Barry

Attorney at Barry & Co

405 W Main St Ste 101

Lafayette, LA 70501

Sean Paul Rabalais

Attorney at Casler Bordelon et al (BR)

4000 S Sherwood Forest Blvd Ste 303

Baton Rouge, LA 70816

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 8/9/2022. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/19/2022. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#15

(#13) DEFICIENT. ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(aty,Rabalais, Sean) Modified on 5/10/2022 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 5/27/2022 to indicate #15 Corrected Answer submitted. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Deficiency to Sean Paul Rabalais on behalf of Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co regarding #13 Answer to Amended Complaint. Reason: Please resubmit document on letter size pdf. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#13

(#13) DEFICIENT. ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(aty,Rabalais, Sean) Modified on 5/10/2022 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 5/27/2022 to indicate #15 Corrected Answer submitted. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Deficiency to Sean Paul Rabalais on behalf of Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co regarding #10 Answer to Complaint. Reason: Please re-submit this document as letter sized pdf. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parents, Progressive Direct Holdings Inc, Progressive Corp for Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(aty,Rabalais, Sean) Modified on 5/6/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#10

(#10) DEFICIENT. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(aty,Rabalais, Sean) Modified on 5/6/2022 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 6/7/2022 to indicate #15 Corrected Answer submitted. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Deficiency to Sean Paul Rabalais on behalf of Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co regarding #8 Answer to Amended Complaint & Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reason: Please re-submit the documents on letter sized paper and file separately. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

8 #1

7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement

#4

(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/26/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/25/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to James J Young, IV, Stephen R Barry, Daphne P McNutt on behalf of Geico County Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/9/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

1 #5

Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Affidavit Verification

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Correspondence from plaintiff counsel

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Citation issued to GEICO showing service

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages

#1

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to James J Young, IV, Stephen R Barry, Daphne P McNutt on behalf of Geico County Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/9/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 8/9/2022. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/19/2022. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(aty,Rabalais, Sean) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Deficiency to Sean Paul Rabalais on behalf of Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co regarding #13 Answer to Amended Complaint. Reason: Please resubmit document on letter size pdf. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFICIENT. ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(aty,Rabalais, Sean) Modified on 5/10/2022 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 5/27/2022 to indicate #15 Corrected Answer submitted. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Deficiency to Sean Paul Rabalais on behalf of Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co regarding #10 Answer to Complaint. Reason: Please re-submit this document as letter sized pdf. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parents, Progressive Direct Holdings Inc, Progressive Corp for Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(aty,Rabalais, Sean) Modified on 5/6/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFICIENT. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(aty,Rabalais, Sean) Modified on 5/6/2022 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 6/7/2022 to indicate #15 Corrected Answer submitted. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Deficiency to Sean Paul Rabalais on behalf of Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co regarding #8 Answer to Amended Complaint & Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reason: Please re-submit the documents on letter sized paper and file separately. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFICIENT. ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Attorney Sean Paul Rabalais added to party Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Rabalais, Sean) Modified on 5/6/2022 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 6/7/2022 to indicate #15 Corrected Answer submitted.(Crick, S). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) GEICO and Harry Brown, Jr.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand and Original Petition by Geico County Mutual Insurance Co.(aty,Young, James) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketState Court ORDER granting Motion for 30 Day Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings signed by state court judge on 4/21/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to #5 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT against Harry Brown, Jr, Geico County Mutual Insurance Co, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co filed by Demi A Segura. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to #5 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Geico County Mutual Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, Geico Corp for Geico County Mutual Insurance Co, Berkshire Hathaway Inc for Geico County Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Young, James) Modified on 4/26/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Geico County Mutual Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings)(aty,Young, James) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/26/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/25/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to James J Young, IV, Stephen R Barry, Daphne P McNutt on behalf of Geico County Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/9/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Geico County Mutual Insurance Co answer due 4/29/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 TO THE #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal by GEICO County Mutual Insurance Co, Harry Brown Jr. from 16th JDC St. Martin Parish, Case Number 91439 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5078444) filed by Geico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit 2 - Citation issued to GEICO showing service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence from plaintiff counsel, #4 Affidavit Verification, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James J Young, IV added to party Geico(pty:dft))(aty,Young, James) Modified on 4/25/2022 to edit text and add filer (Jones, P). (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico is a litigant