This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 09:13:12 (UTC).

Segovia et al v. City of Dallas, Texas et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Segovia filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Dallas, Texas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01514

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Evelyn Segovia

Manuel Segovia

Angie Segovia

Juan Segovia Ramirez

Juana Segovia

Defendants

Craig Houston

Robert Beck

Kenneth Brown

Ashleigh Warren

Rodney Featherston

Alexis Booker-Lewis

Michael Rumsey

City of Dallas, Texas

Maxwell Boeckel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Roberts

Attorney at Scott H Palmer PC

15455 Dallas Pkwy, Suite 540

Addison, TX 75001

Scott H Palmer

Attorney at Scott H Palmer PC

15455 Dallas Parkway, Suite 540 Lb 32

Addison, TX 75001

Defendant Attorneys

Lindsay Erin Wilson Gowin

Attorney at Dallas City Attorney's Office

1500 Marilla Street, Room 7Bn

Dallas, TX 75201

Devin Quaalon Alexander

Attorney at Dallas City Attorney's Office

1500 Marilla Street, #7Dn

Dallas, TX 75201

John Cheves Ligon

Attorney at Dallas City Attorney's Office

1500 Marilla Street

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Robert Beck, Maxwell Boeckel, Kenneth Brown, Rodney Featherston, Craig Houston, Michael Rumsey, Ashleigh Warren (Wilson Gowin, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lindsay Erin Wilson Gowin on behalf of Robert Beck, Maxwell Boeckel, Kenneth Brown, City of Dallas, Texas, Rodney Featherston, Craig Houston, Michael Rumsey, Ashleigh Warren. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wilson Gowin, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rodney Featherston. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

9 #5

Additional Page(s)

9 #4

Additional Page(s)

9 #3

Additional Page(s)

9 #2

Additional Page(s)

9 #1

Additional Page(s)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert Beck. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Maxwell Boeckel. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Kenneth Brown. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Craig Houston. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Michael Rumsey. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Ashleigh Warren. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s)) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint filed by City of Dallas, Texas (Alexander, Devin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY/DOCUMENT WILL BE REFILED***Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint filed by City of Dallas, Texas Attorney Devin Quaalon Alexander added to party City of Dallas, Texas(pty:dft) (Alexander, Devin) Modified on 7/22/2021 (ykp). (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Robert Beck, Maxwell Boeckel, Alexis Booker-Lewis, Kenneth Brown, City of Dallas, Texas, Rodney Featherston, Craig Houston, Michael Rumsey, Ashleigh Warren. (ndt) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Angie Segovia, Evelyn Segovia, Juana Segovia, Manuel Segovia, Juan Segovia Ramirez. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Manuel Segovia, Juana Segovia, Juan Segovia Ramirez, Angie Segovia, Evelyn Segovia. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12016109) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond Robert Beck answer or response due 9/22/2021; Maxwell Boeckel answer or response due 9/22/2021; Alexis Booker-Lewis answer or response due 9/22/2021; Kenneth Brown answer or response due 9/22/2021; Rodney Featherston answer or response due 9/22/2021; Craig Houston answer or response due 9/22/2021; Michael Rumsey answer or response due 9/22/2021; Ashleigh Warren answer or response due 9/22/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/25/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Robert Beck, Maxwell Boeckel, Kenneth Brown, Rodney Featherston, Craig Houston, Michael Rumsey, Ashleigh Warren (Wilson Gowin, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lindsay Erin Wilson Gowin on behalf of Robert Beck, Maxwell Boeckel, Kenneth Brown, City of Dallas, Texas, Rodney Featherston, Craig Houston, Michael Rumsey, Ashleigh Warren. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wilson Gowin, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rodney Featherston. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert Beck. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Maxwell Boeckel. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Kenneth Brown. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Craig Houston. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Michael Rumsey. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021; Ashleigh Warren. Waiver sent on 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s)) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Dallas, Texas ; served on 7/1/2021. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. City of Dallas, Texas answer or response due 9/22/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/22/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint filed by City of Dallas, Texas (Alexander, Devin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY/DOCUMENT WILL BE REFILED***Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint filed by City of Dallas, Texas Attorney Devin Quaalon Alexander added to party City of Dallas, Texas(pty:dft) (Alexander, Devin) Modified on 7/22/2021 (ykp). (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Robert Beck, Maxwell Boeckel, Alexis Booker-Lewis, Kenneth Brown, City of Dallas, Texas, Rodney Featherston, Craig Houston, Michael Rumsey, Ashleigh Warren. (ndt) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Angie Segovia, Evelyn Segovia, Juana Segovia, Manuel Segovia, Juan Segovia Ramirez. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Manuel Segovia, Juana Segovia, Juan Segovia Ramirez, Angie Segovia, Evelyn Segovia. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12016109) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott H. Palmer