This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2022 at 06:56:23 (UTC).

Segars v. Truist Bank

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Segars filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Truist Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce Howe Hendricks and Kevin McDonald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-01869

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

Referral Judge

Kevin McDonald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thaddeus Segars

Hilton Head Island, SC 29928

Defendants

Truist Bank

SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Adams Abee

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit Articles of Amendment

1 #3

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Truist Bank.(kric, ) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Proposed Order

6 #2

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Truist Bank. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Truist Bank.(kric, ) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-07-0720. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10538788), filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Articles of Amendment, #3 Certificate of Service)(kric, ) Modified on 6/14/2022 to edit filing date (kric, ). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST MORTGAGE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Adams Abee(Designation Retained)