This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 07:09:43 (UTC).

Yanira Segal v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Yanira Segal filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09110

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yanira Segal

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 to 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chad Allen David

Attorney at Law Offices of Jon Jacobs

One Ridgegate Drive Suite 245

Temecula, CA 92590

Jon P Jacobs

Attorney at Law Offices of Jon Jacobs

1 Ridgegate Drive Suite 245

Temecula, CA 92590

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha Koopersmith

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#10

(#10) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Yanira Segal.. (David, Chad) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Yanira Segal.. (David, Chad) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Filed in State Court on 11/19/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does 1 to 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Yanira Segal. Filed in State Court on 10/19/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV38612 Receipt No: ACACDC-32362789 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Samantha Koopersmith added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Koopersmith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman