This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 08:06:06 (UTC).

Seeney v. Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Seeney filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01564

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Seeney

Defendants

Insurance Company of North America

ESIS, Inc.

Chubb Limited

Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Andrews

Attorney at The Law Office of Joseph Andrews

737 S Queen St, Suite 3

Dover, DE 19904

Taylor Elizabeth Trapp Nicholl

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph Andrews

737 S. Queen Street, Suite 3

Dover, DE 19904

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph J. Bellew

Attorney at White & Williams

600 North King Street, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801-3722

Karine Sarkisian

Attorney at White & Williams

600 North King Street, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801-3722

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

19 #1

Certificate of Service

17 #5

Text of Proposed Order

14 #1

Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

13 #3

Exhibit C

13 #2

Exhibit B

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#14) First Compendium of Unreported Decisions re #13 Reply Brief by Richard Seeney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Joseph) Modified on 11/29/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/25/2021)

#10

(#20) Letter to Hon. Maryellen Noreika from Joseph Andrews regarding Plaintiff's Hard Copies and Position on Request for Oral Argument - re #10 Opening Brief in Support, #9 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Response to Motion,, #19 Compendium of Unreported Decisions, #18 Reply Brief, #16 Letter,. (Andrews, Joseph) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

3 #4

Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

3 #2

Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Case Number K21C-09-038 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3735286)- filed by Insurance Company of North America, Ace Property and Casualty Insurance, ESIS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Letter to Hon. Maryellen Noreika from Joseph Andrews regarding DEL. L.R. 81.2 - re #7 Answer to Complaint, #13 Reply Brief, #12 Response to Motion, #11 Compendium of Unreported Decisions, #17 Reply to Response to Motion, #22 Notice of Appearance, #14 Compendium of Unreported Decisions, #10 Opening Brief in Support, #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court of Delaware, #9 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Response to Motion,, #6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court of Delaware, #19 Compendium of Unreported Decisions, #18 Reply Brief, #8 Response to Motion,. (Andrews, Joseph) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Elizabeth Trapp Nicholl on behalf of Richard Seeney (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Trapp Nicholl, Taylor) Modified on 12/17/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Joseph J. Bellew regarding Oral Argument request - re #9 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Response to Motion,. (Bellew, Joseph) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Letter to Hon. Maryellen Noreika from Joseph Andrews regarding Plaintiff's Hard Copies and Position on Request for Oral Argument - re #10 Opening Brief in Support, #9 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Response to Motion,, #19 Compendium of Unreported Decisions, #18 Reply Brief, #16 Letter,. (Andrews, Joseph) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Compendium of Unreported Decisions re #18 Reply Brief, by Richard Seeney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Joseph) Modified on 12/13/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Response to Motion filed by Richard Seeney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Joseph) Modified on 12/13/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Response to Motion, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co., ESIS, Inc., Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Unpublished Cases, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(Bellew, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First Letter to Hon. Maryellen Noreika from Joseph Andrews regarding Plaintiff's Position on Request for Oral Argument - re #7 Answer to Complaint, #15 Letter, #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court of Delaware, #9 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Response to Motion,, #6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court of Delaware, #8 Response to Motion,. (Andrews, Joseph) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Joseph J. Bellew, Esquire regarding Briefing and Oral Argument on Case - re #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court of Delaware, #9 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Response to Motion,. (Bellew, Joseph) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First Compendium of Unreported Decisions re #13 Reply Brief by Richard Seeney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Joseph) Modified on 11/29/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Response to Motion for Default - filed by Richard Seeney.(dlw) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default re #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court of Delaware, #6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court of Delaware filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co., ESIS, Inc., Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Bellew, Joseph) Modified on 11/12/2021 (mdb). (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co., ESIS, Inc., Insurance Company of North America.(Bellew, Joseph) Modified on 11/10/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court of Delaware - filed by Richard Seeney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Amended Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Notice of Motion, #6 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Joseph) Modified on 11/10/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co., ESIS, Inc., Insurance Company of North America. (Bellew, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co., ESIS, Inc., Insurance Company of North America. (Bellew, Joseph) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First MOTION to Remand to State Court of Delaware - filed by Richard Seeney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Motion, #4 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Joseph) Modified on 11/10/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Case Number K21C-09-038 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3735286)- filed by Insurance Company of North America, Ace Property and Casualty Insurance, ESIS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chubb Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where ESIS INC. DOE1 is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant