This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 19:55:09 (UTC).

Seeks v. The Boeing Company

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Seeks filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against The Boeing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02394

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Seeks

Petitioners

Ali Alibrahim

John Armstrong

Mercer Busch

The Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi

Robert W. Kegley, Sr.

Pierre Givenchy

Kenny W. Wang

Joseph Fields

Kenny K. Wang

Richard Miller

Kathleen Wang

Richard Eads

Kin-Yip Chun

Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada

Defendants

Gregory D. Smith

Boeing Company, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Jason A. Zweig

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp

455 N. Cityfront Plaza Dr., Suite 2410

Chicago, IL 60611

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 2Nd Ave., Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Reed R Kathrein

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Andrew Szot

Attorney at Miller Law LLC

115 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2910

Chicago, IL 60603

Marvin Alan Miller

Attorney at Miller Law LLC

115 South Lasalle Street, Suite 2910

Chicago, IL 60603

Ramzi Abadou

Attorney at Kahn Swick & Foti LLP

912 Cole Street # 251

San Diego, CA 94117

Avi Josefson

Attorney at Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger & Grossmann LLP

875 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60611

Alejandro Caffarelli

Attorney at Caffarelli & Associates Ltd.

224 S Michigan, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60604

Sharan Nirmul

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer Check

280 King Of Prussia Rd

Radnor, PA 19087

Ryan T. Degnan

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Madeline K. Engel

Attorney at Caffarelli & Associates Ltd.

224 South Michigan Ave, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60604

Lewis S Kahn

Attorney at Kahn Swick Foti LLC

1100 Poydras St

New Orleans, LA 70163

J. Alexander Hood, II

Attorney at Pomerantz Llp

600 Third Avenue, Floor 20

New York, NY 10016

James E Barz

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

200 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

Frank Anthony Richter

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

200 S. Wacker, 31St Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Danielle S. Myers

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

655 W Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

John F. Hartmann

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Craig S. Primis

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

655 Fifteenth St., Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Joshua Z Rabinovitz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#89

#88

#87

#86

85 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

85 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

85 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#85

#84

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 21, 2019 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 35276. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2019. (Fitzgerald, Kelly) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The Wang Family's motion to modify briefing schedule #84 is denied. No hearing on the motion will be held. The motion alleges conduct about which the relevant parties should be permitted to respond. The need to address these issues confirms the need for adequate time for briefing, rather than an acceleration of a schedule entered by agreement of all counsel even after some of the events on which the motion relies purportedly occurred. Briefing will continue as scheduled. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant The Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi by Avi Josefson (Josefson, Avi) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) NOTICE of Motion by Ramzi Abadou for presentment of motion to reset #84 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 7/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Abadou, Ramzi) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) DECLARATION of Ramzi Abadou regarding motion to reset #84 briefing for motion to appointment lead plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Abadou, Ramzi) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) MOTION by Movants Kathleen Wang, Kenny K. Wang, Kenny W. Wang to reset briefing on lead plaintiff appointment (Abadou, Ramzi) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion hearing held. The motions for consolidation of related actions, appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of lead counsel #32 #36 #41 #46 #52 are granted in part. The Court orders consolidation of cases 19 cv 3548 and 19 cv 2394 under case number 19 cv 2394. The Court administratively terminates case number 19 cv 3548. All further proceedings will go forward under case number 19 cv 2394. The Court grants defendants' motion to extend defendants' deadline to respond to the complaint #67 . Defendants' responsive pleading is stayed pending further order of the Court. Responses to the pending motions for appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of lead counsel #32 #36 #41 #46 #52 are due by 7/19/2019; replies due by 8/2/2019. Status hearing set for 6/27/19 and initial status report due 6/25/19 #16 are stricken. Once the motions are fully briefed, the Court will rule via CM/ECF and set a future date.Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the Boeing Investor Group's notice of withdrawal #75 and Ali Alibrahim's notice of withdrawal #76 their motions to consolidate cases, appoint lead plaintiff, and approve lead counsel, said motions #49 , #27 are denied as moot. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Richard Seeks by Jason A. Zweig (Zweig, Jason) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada by Frank Anthony Richter (Richter, Frank) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The "Brief of Amicus Curiae" #7 is stricken and the motion for leave to file contained therein is denied. While the Court thanks Mr. Keyter for his interest in this matter, to the extent that Mr. Keyster has information and evidence relevant to the pending complaint, he should contact counsel for the parties in the case or appropriate governmental authorities. This Court has no authority to consider unsolicited evidentiary submissions from persons who are not parties in this proceeding. It will be for the parties in the first instance to offer any such evidence, at the appropriate juncture, should they deem the evidence to be admissible in this case, and to object to such evidence if they deem it to be inadmissible. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE Anthony Keyter - In support of Richard Seeks, et al / future Investors, and in support of flight safety. by Richard Seeks (mc, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Dennis A Muilenburg, Gregory D Smith, The Boeing Company (jn, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fegan, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Richard Seeks by Steve W. Berman (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Richard Seeks by Reed R Kathrein (Kathrein, Reed) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Richard Seeks by Elizabeth A. Fegan (Fegan, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Richard Seeks; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15694364. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fegan, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Labourers' Pension Fund of Central and Eastern Canada is a litigant

Latest cases where Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F. Hartmann