This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 09:18:13 (UTC).

Seekford v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Seekford filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03883

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Autumn Seekford

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook Holdings, LLC

Facebook Operations, LLC

Facebook Payments, Inc.

Facebook Technologies, LLC

Instagram, LLC

Siculus, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dena C. Sharp

Attorney at Girard Sharp LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

Adam E. Polk

Attorney at Girard Sharp LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

Clinton K. Richardson

Attorney at Beasley Allen et al

218 Commerce St

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Autumn Seekford (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-AL Bar

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Autumn Seekford.. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Clinton Richardson's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Autumn Seekford. Service waived by All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Autumn Seekford. Service waived by All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Clinton Richardson's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Autumn Seekford.. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17315042.) filed by Autumn Seekford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-AL Bar)(Richardson, Clinton) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/14/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Autumn Seekford (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17313828.). Filed byAutumn Seekford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Siculus, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant