This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2022 at 10:49:45 (UTC).

Seda v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Seda filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sunbeam Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06900

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Seda

Defendants

Sunbeam Products, Inc.

Newell Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Didi Hutt

Attorney at Mirman Markovits & Landau PC

291 Broadway, Ste 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorneys

David Scott Osterman

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP (NJ)

902 Carnegie Center, St 100

Princeton, NJ 08540

Matthew George Miller

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

600 Lexington Avenue, Suite 900

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Documents filed on Docket

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - All Pleadings

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc...(Miller, Matthew) Modified on 8/15/2022 (lb). (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc...(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Didi Hutt on behalf of Veronica Seda..(Hutt, Didi) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Scott Osterman on behalf of Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc...(Osterman, David) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL TELECONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear telephonically for an initial conference with the Court, on the date and time listed below. Prior to the teleconference, the dial-in and access code information will be posted to ECF. Attorneys are directed to consult this Court's Individual Practices with respect to communications with Chambers, adjournments, motions and related matters. IT IS SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/15/2022) (tg) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#8

(#8) RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Veronica Seda..(Hutt, Didi) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/28/2022. (ade) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Veronica Seda..(Hutt, Didi) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketORDER The dial-in for the conference at 4:00 P.M. is (888) 363-4749 and the access code is 2712517. (Reisig, Lauren) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL TELECONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear telephonically for an initial conference with the Court, on the date and time listed below. Prior to the teleconference, the dial-in and access code information will be posted to ECF. Attorneys are directed to consult this Court's Individual Practices with respect to communications with Chambers, adjournments, motions and related matters. IT IS SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/15/2022) (tg) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Scott Osterman on behalf of Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc...(Osterman, David) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Didi Hutt on behalf of Veronica Seda..(Hutt, Didi) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Matthew George Miller. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Matthew George Miller to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc...(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc...(Miller, Matthew) Modified on 8/15/2022 (lb). (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 809778/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26543796).Document filed by Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Documents filed on Docket, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - All Pleadings).(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less