This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2023 at 08:20:20 (UTC).

Security National Insurance Company v. Evanston Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Security National Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Evanston Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00785

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Security National Insurance Company

Defendant

Evanston Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert V Closson

Jodi E. Lambert

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34727572 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation. (Attorney Jodi E Lambert added to party Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation(pty:pla))(Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation. (Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation, (Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation. (Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11-C) (car) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

5 #1

CV11-C

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Evanston Insurance Company. (hr) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing either: a. Proof of service with the Court; or b. A statement (not to exceed 3 pages) explaining the status of service. (Note: do not attach a proof of service to any explanatory statement.) Plaintiff's submission is due by or before March 23, 2023. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#8

(#8) AMENDED ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, amending Order Re: Proof of Service #7 . (see document for details) (hr) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, upon Defendant Evanston Insurance Company served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Evanston Insurance Company, an Illinois Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#10

(#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Evanston Insurance Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company(Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Evanston Insurance Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company(Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, upon Defendant Evanston Insurance Company served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Evanston Insurance Company, an Illinois Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, amending Order Re: Proof of Service #7 . (see document for details) (hr) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing either: a. Proof of service with the Court; or b. A statement (not to exceed 3 pages) explaining the status of service. (Note: do not attach a proof of service to any explanatory statement.) Plaintiff's submission is due by or before March 23, 2023. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Evanston Insurance Company. (hr) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11-C) (car) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation. (Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation, (Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation. (Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34727572 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation. (Attorney Jodi E Lambert added to party Security National Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation(pty:pla))(Lambert, Jodi) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less