This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2022 at 13:32:39 (UTC).

Security Limits Inc., v. Avangrid Networks, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On November 29, 2021, Security Limits, Inc., (“Plaintiff”), represented by John M. Griem of Carter Ledyard & Milburn, LLP and Peter Adelman of the Law Offices of Peter Adelman, filed a RICO lawsuit against Avangrid Networks, Inc.; Avangrid, Inc.; Iberdrola S.A.; Unlimited Technology, Inc.; Cipher Security, LLC; and others (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking treble damages, an imposition of a constructive trust and other reliefs for the Defendants’ alleged conspiracy and breach of contract. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Southern District of New York with Judge Gregory H. Woods presiding.

 

In the complaint the Plaintiff alleged that, “This action arises out of a brazen racketeering scheme, replete with bid-rigging, accounting manipulation, warehouses built solely to house mountains of unused equipment procured under bogus pretenses, and the misappropriation and illicit transfer of proprietary business secrets. The scheme (the “Bid-Rigging Scheme”) was operated through Defendant Avangrid Networks, Inc. (“Networks”), a company operating regulated energy utilities in New York and New England.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “As alleged in greater detail below, in combination with its confederates, the Utilities Defendants conducted the Bid-Rigging Scheme in order to steer valuable contracts to certain of SLI’s competitors – ones willing to participate in a pay-to-play scheme. In certain cases, the Utilities Defendants and/or Prosegur forced SLI to partner with favored vendors such as Cipher, PSM and B&V as a condition of bidding for contracts that SLI should have otherwise been able to pursue on its exclusive behalf.” 

 

The Plaintiff then alleged that, “in other instances, the Utilities Defendants and/or Prosegur entities shared or caused to be shared the misappropriated trade secrets and bidding information of Plaintiff SLI with its competitors, effectively foreordaining the award of valuable contracts to those vendors and resulting in the wholesale subversion of Avangrid’s bid process.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Under the Bid-Rigging Scheme, the Utilities Defendants eschewed competitive bidding, engaged in customer and market allocation, and steered contracts to vendors willing to provide equipment and services that were neither competitively priced nor situationally appropriate (and in some cases, unnecessary altogether). The Utilities Defendants awarded these inappropriate contracts in order, inter alia, to aid it in meeting critical quarterly capital expenditure targets in order to claim consistent depreciation benefits, and for personal gain.” 

 

The Plaintiff continued to allege that, “the Bid-Rigging Scheme, and its inherent waste, deprived SLI of valuable contracts it would have otherwise been awarded in an unrigged bidding process, wasted millions of rate-payers’ dollars, and wrongly enriched the Bid-Rigging Scheme’s participants.”

 

There are fifteen claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim alleged is for civil RICO based on Defendants’ participation in the affairs of network. The second claim alleged is for civil RICO conspiracy. The third claim alleged is for civil RICO based on Defendants’ association as criminal enterprise. The fourth claim alleged is for civil RICO conspiracy. The fifth claim alleged is for violation of the Robinson-Patman Act. The sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth and tenth claims alleged are for breach of contract. The eleventh, twelfth and thirteenth claims alleged are for misappropriation of trade secrets. The fourteenth claim alleged is for tortious interference. The fifteenth claim alleged is for unjust enrichment. 

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for damages with reference to specific causes of action and treble damages, along with attorneys’ fees and any other relief the Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10124

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Security Limits Inc.,

Defendants

Prosegur Security Monitoring, Inc.

Avangrid Networks, Inc.

Avangrid, Inc.

Iberdrola S.A.

Prosegur Gestin de Activos, S.L.

Unlimited Technology, Inc.

Cipher Security, LLC

Viewpoint CRM, Inc.

Black & Veatch Corporation

David Lathrop

John Allen

Tom Fitzgerald

Enrique Victoreo

Antonio Asenjo Martin

Ed Boucas

Andre Viera Rolim

Bill Reilly

John Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Michael Griem

Attorney at Carter Ledyard & Milburn, LLP (NYC)

2 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Peter Adelman

Attorney at The Law Offices of Peter Adelman

95 6Th Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11217

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Allen, Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid, Inc., Black & Veatch Corporation, Ed Boucas, Cipher Security, LLC, John Does, Tom Fitzgerald, Iberdrola S.A., David Lathrop, Antonio Asenjo Martin, Prosegur Gestin de Activos, S.L., Prosegur Security Monitoring, Inc., Bill Reilly, Andre Viera Rolim, Unlimited Technology, Inc., Enrique Victoreo. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25393981)Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,..(Griem, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Griem, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,..(Griem, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid, Inc., Iberdrola S.A., Prosegur Gestion de Activos, S.L., Unlimited Technology, Inc., Cipher Security, LLC., Prosegur Security Monitoring, Inc. f/k/a Viewpoint CRM, Inc., Black & Veatch Corporation, David Lathrop, John Allen, Tom Fitzgerald, Enrique Victoreo, Antonio Asenjo Martin, Ed Boucas, Andrea Viera Rolim, Bill Reilly, and John Does 1 to 100, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,..(Griem, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Adelman on behalf of Security Limits Inc.,..(Adelman, Peter) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Allen, Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid, Inc., Black & Veatch Corporation, Ed Boucas, Cipher Security, LLC, Tom Fitzgerald, Iberdrola S.A., David Lathrop, Antonio Asenjo Martin, Prosegur Gestin de Activos, S.L., Prosegur Security Monitoring, Inc., Bill Reilly, Andre Viera Rolim, Unlimited Technology, Inc., Enrique Victoreo..(jgo) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: February 10, 2022. DATE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: February 17, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Courts Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Initial Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/30/2021) (mml) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) John Allen, Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid, Inc., Black & Veatch Corporation, Ed Boucas, Cipher Security, LLC, John Does, Tom Fitzgerald, Iberdrola S.A., David Lathrop, Antonio Asenjo Martin, Prosegur Gestin de Activos, S.L., Prosegur Security Monitoring, Inc., Bill Reilly, Andre Viera Rolim, Unlimited Technology, Inc., Enrique Victoreo. Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Griem, John) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) John Allen, Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid, Inc., Black & Veatch Corporation, Ed Boucas, Cipher Security, LLC, John Does, Tom Fitzgerald, Iberdrola S.A., David Lathrop, Antonio Asenjo Martin, Prosegur Gestin de Activos, S.L., Prosegur Security Monitoring, Inc., Bill Reilly, Andre Viera Rolim, Unlimited Technology, Inc., Enrique Victoreo. Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Griem, John) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: February 10, 2022. DATE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: February 17, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Courts Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Initial Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/30/2021) (mml) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Allen, Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid, Inc., Black & Veatch Corporation, Ed Boucas, Cipher Security, LLC, Tom Fitzgerald, Iberdrola S.A., David Lathrop, Antonio Asenjo Martin, Prosegur Gestin de Activos, S.L., Prosegur Security Monitoring, Inc., Bill Reilly, Andre Viera Rolim, Unlimited Technology, Inc., Enrique Victoreo..(jgo) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Adelman on behalf of Security Limits Inc.,..(Adelman, Peter) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid, Inc., Iberdrola S.A., Prosegur Gestion de Activos, S.L., Unlimited Technology, Inc., Cipher Security, LLC., Prosegur Security Monitoring, Inc. f/k/a Viewpoint CRM, Inc., Black & Veatch Corporation, David Lathrop, John Allen, Tom Fitzgerald, Enrique Victoreo, Antonio Asenjo Martin, Ed Boucas, Andrea Viera Rolim, Bill Reilly, and John Does 1 to 100, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,..(Griem, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,..(Griem, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Griem, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Allen, Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid, Inc., Black & Veatch Corporation, Ed Boucas, Cipher Security, LLC, John Does, Tom Fitzgerald, Iberdrola S.A., David Lathrop, Antonio Asenjo Martin, Prosegur Gestin de Activos, S.L., Prosegur Security Monitoring, Inc., Bill Reilly, Andre Viera Rolim, Unlimited Technology, Inc., Enrique Victoreo. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25393981)Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,..(Griem, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avangrid, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BLACK VAETCH CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Michael Griem