This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2023 at 15:14:45 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Xia et al

Case Summary

On September 27, 2021, Securities and Exchange Commission (the “Commission” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Brenda Wai Ming Chang, David Paul Stoelting, Judith Ann Weinstock, Kevin P. McGrath, Lara Shalov Mehraban and Richard R. Best, attorneys at SEC’s New York regional office, filed a civil enforcement action against Richard Xia, a/k/a Yi Xia (“Xia”), Fleet New York Metropolitan Regional Center LLC, f/k/a Federal New York Metropolitan Regional Center, LLC (“Fleet”), and Relief Defendant Julia Yue, a/k/a JiQing Yue (“Yue”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking permanent injunctive relief including an asset freeze, disgorgement of all ill-gotten gains, prejudgment interest and other relief for misuse of investor funds. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Eastern District of New York with Judges Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Cheryl L. Pollak presiding.

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “From 2010 through late 2017, Defendants fraudulently raised more than $229 million by offering and selling limited partnership interests to more than 450 investors. In connection with the offerings, Xia acted by and through Fleet, the General Partner of the limited partnerships that issued the securities.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Relying on the Defendants’ representations, investors contributed $56 million to the Eastern Mirage Project. Although the offering materials represented that the project would be completed in 2013, today it is an unfinished and empty glass tower. Between 2014 and 2017, investors contributed $173 million to the Eastern Emerald Project. Today, it remains a largely vacant dirt hole surrounded by a concrete wall.”

Further, Plaintiff alleged that, “A total of at least $9.7 million in ill-gotten gains was routed to personal bank accounts for Julia Yue for no legitimate business purpose. This includes $4.1 million she received between January 2012 and January 2019 and an additional $5.6 million she received in April and May 2021.”

Plaintiff then alleged that “About $77 million in investor funds remains in Xia-controlled bank accounts, which is insufficient to repay investors. Of the investor funds remaining, approximately $18 million were in CDs that matured on September 26, 2021 and are now readily available for Defendants’ potential misuse. The Defendants’ actions have jeopardized the investors’ prospects for any return of their capital contributions. And Xia continues to misuse investor funds.”

There are three claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim is for the alleged violation of Securities Act section 17(a), the second claim is for alleged violation of Exchange Act Section 10(b) and Rule 10b-5, and the third claim is for alleged unjust enrichment.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order for an award of permanent injunctive relief along with an order for disgorgement of all ill gotten gains with prejudgment interest, civil monetary penalties pursuant Exchange Act Sections 21(d)(5) and 21(d)(7) [15 U.S.C. §§ 78u(d)(5) and 78u(d)(7)], and such further relief as the court may deem just and proper. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05350

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

Richard Xia

Fleet New York Metropolitan Regional Center LLC

Julia Yue

Yi Xia

Federal New York Metropolitan Regional Center, LLC

Jiqing Yue

Receiver

Matthew Scott Peeler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brenda Wai Ming Chang

David Paul Stoelting

Judith Ann Weinstock

Kevin P McGrath

Kim Han

Lara Shalov Mehraban

Richard R. Best

Defendant Attorney

Herve Gouraige

Receiver Attorney

Matthew Scott Peeler

 

Court Documents

22 #2

Proposed Order

22 #1

Declaration of M. Scott Peeler

#22

ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appoint Expert. The Monitor's retention of J.S. Held is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/3/2021. (Mahkamova, Shirin) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

6 #10

Ex. 10

6 #9

Ex.9

2 #3

Declaration David Stoelting

2 #2

Memorandum in Support

2 #1

Proposed Order Appointing Monitor

#2

(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Appointing Monitor, #2 Memorandum in Support) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2021: #3 Declaration David Stoelting) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fleet New York Metropolitan Regional Center LLC, Richard Xia, Julia Yue. (Gouraige, Herve) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#26

(#26) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Recommendation re the Projects by Matthew Scott Peeler. (Peeler, Matthew) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#25

(#25) Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference Stipulation and Proposed Order to Adjourn Show-Cause Hearing by Securities and Exchange Commission. (McGrath, Kevin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Herve Gouraige on behalf of Fleet New York Metropolitan Regional Center LLC, Richard Xia, Julia Yue (notification declined or already on case) (Gouraige, Herve) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fleet New York Metropolitan Regional Center LLC, Richard Xia, Julia Yue. (Gouraige, Herve) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#5

#4

#3

160 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Monitor's #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File is granted. Monitor shall submit his recommendation to the Court on or before January 28, 2022. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/23/2021. (Mahkamova, Shirin) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Recommendation re the Projects by Matthew Scott Peeler. (Peeler, Matthew) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The #25 motion to adjourn the show-cause hearing previously scheduled for 12/8/2021, on consent of the parties, is granted, and the parties' stipulation is so ordered. The show-cause hearing is adjourned until 1/14/2022, 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 4F North. Defendants and Relief Defendant shall file opposition papers by 12/23/2021, 5:00 p.m.; and the Commission shall file reply papers by 1/7/2022, 5:00 p.m. The relief granted in the 11 Order to Show Cause and 11 -1 Order Appointing Monitor is extended through January 14, 2022, in light of the schedule set forth herein. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/19/2021. (Mahkamova, Shirin) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference Stipulation and Proposed Order to Adjourn Show-Cause Hearing by Securities and Exchange Commission. (McGrath, Kevin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Herve Gouraige on behalf of Fleet New York Metropolitan Regional Center LLC, Richard Xia, Julia Yue (notification declined or already on case) (Gouraige, Herve) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER re #23 : Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendants Fleet New York Metropolitan Regional Center LLC's and Richard Xia's answers are due on 11/30/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/10/2021. (Henney, Scott) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fleet New York Metropolitan Regional Center LLC, Richard Xia, Julia Yue. (Gouraige, Herve) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #22 Motion to Appoint Expert. The Monitor's retention of J.S. Held is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/3/2021. (Mahkamova, Shirin) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: In light of Judge Pollak's November 1, 2021 Order granting the #21 motion to withdraw as counsel for Defendants and Relief Defendant and directing new counsel to file a notice of appearance on the record by 11/15/2021, the Court sua sponte extends the deadline for Defendants and Relief Defendant to file opposition papers to 11/22/2021, 5:00 p.m.; the Commission shall file reply papers by 11/26/2021, 5:00 p.m. The show-cause hearing is hereby adjourned to 12/8/2021, 3:00 p.m, in Courtroom 4F North. The relief granted in the 11 Order to Show Cause and [11 -1] Order Appointing Monitor is extended through December 8, 2021, in light of the schedule set forth herein.Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/2/2021. (Mahkamova, Shirin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER re #21 : Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Marc Lee Mukasey; Kenneth A. Caruso and Robert S. Frenchman terminated. Defendants have two weeks from the date of this Order, until 11/15/2021, for new counsel to file a notice of appearance on the record. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/1/2021. (Henney, Scott) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unsigned Order to Show Cause by Securities and Exchange Commission (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION Raymond Dookhie by Securities and Exchange Commission (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2021: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7, #8 Ex. 8, #9 Ex.9, #10 Ex. 10, #11 Ex. 11, #12 Ex. 12, #13 Ex. 13, #14 Ex. 14, #15 Ex. 15, #16 Ex. 16, #17 Ex. 17, #18 Ex. 18, #19 Ex. 19, #20 Ex. 20, #21 Ex. 21, #22 Ex. 22, #23 Ex. 23, #24 Ex. 24, #25 Ex. 25, #26 Ex. 26, #27 Ex. 27, #28 Ex. 28, #29 Ex. 29, #30 Ex. 30, #31 Ex. 31, #32 Ex. 32, #33 Ex. 33, #34 Ex. 34, #35 Ex. 35, #36 Ex. 36, #37 Ex. 37, #38 Ex. 38, #39 Ex. 39, #40 Ex. 40, #41 Ex. 41, #42 Ex. 42, #43 Ex. 43, #44 Ex. 44, #45 Ex. 45, #46 Ex. 46, #47 Ex. 47, #48 Ex. 48, #49 Ex. 49, #50 Ex. 50, #51 Ex. 51) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION Kim Han by Securities and Exchange Commission (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2021: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7, #8 Ex. 8, #9 Ex.9, #10 Ex. 10, #11 Ex. 11, #12 Ex. 12, #13 Ex. 13, #14 Ex. 14, #15 Ex. 15, #16 Ex. 16, #17 Ex. 17, #18 Ex. 18, #19 Ex. 19, #20 Ex. 20, #21 Ex. 21, #22 Ex. 22, #23 Ex. 23, #24 Ex. 24, #25 Ex. 25, #26 Ex. 26, #27 Ex. 27, #28 Ex. 28, #29 Ex. 29, #30 Ex. 30, #31 Ex. 31, #32 Ex. 32, #33 Ex. 33, #34 Ex. 34, #35 Ex. 35, #36 Ex. 36, #37 Ex. 37, #38 Ex. 38, #39 Ex. 39, #40 Ex. 40, #41 Ex. 41, #42 Ex. 42, #43 Ex. 43, #44 Ex. 44, #45 Ex. 45, #46 Ex. 46, #47 Ex. 47, #48 Ex. 48, #49 Ex. 49, #50 Ex. 50, #51 Ex. 51, #52 Ex. 52, #53 Ex. 53, #54 Ex. 54, #55 Ex. 55, #56 Ex. 56, #57 Ex. 57, #58 Ex. 58, #59 Ex. 59, #60 Ex. 60, #61 Ex. 61, #62 Ex. 62, #63 Ex. 63, #64 Ex. 64, #65 Ex. 65, #66 Ex. 66, #67 Ex. 67, #68 Ex. 68, #69 Ex. 69, #70 Ex. 70, #71 Ex. 71, #72 Ex. 72, #73 Ex. 73, #74 Ex. 74, #75 Ex. 75, #76 Ex. 76, #77 Ex. 77, #78 Ex. 78, #79 Ex. 79, #80 Ex. 80, #81 Ex. 81, #82 Ex. 82, #83 Ex. 83, #84 Ex. 84, #85 Ex. 85, #86 Ex. 86, #87 Ex. 87, #88 Ex. 88, #89 Ex. 89) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION Sunil K. Aggarwal by Securities and Exchange Commission (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION Annie Seelaus by Securities and Exchange Commission (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION Robert Thompson by Securities and Exchange Commission (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Appointing Monitor, #2 Memorandum in Support) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2021: #3 Declaration David Stoelting) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Fleet New York Metropolitan Regional Center LLC, Richard Xia, Julia Yue Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less