This case was last updated from PACER on 07/08/2019 at 07:41:56 (UTC).

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01878

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Defendants

DANNY RAY WILLIAMS

DANNY R. WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan S. Polish

Attorney at UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

175 W. Jackson Blvd.

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. DANNY R. WILLIAMS waiver sent on 5/23/2019. (Polish, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Polish on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Polish, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DANNY RAY WILLIAMS, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Polish, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. DANNY R. WILLIAMS waiver sent on 5/23/2019. (Polish, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Polish on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Polish, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DANNY RAY WILLIAMS, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Polish, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.