This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:26:09 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. White

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against White. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dora Lizette Irizarry and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04825

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dora Lizette Irizarry

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

William White

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric M. Schmidt

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

Lara Shalov Mehraban

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281-1022

Preethi Krishnamurthy

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Additional Corrections

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. William White waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Mehraban, Lara) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Schmidt on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (Schmidt, Eric) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Preethi Krishnamurthy on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (Krishnamurthy, Preethi) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against William White Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mehraban, Lara) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric M. Schmidt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Preethi Krishnamurthy