This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 07:57:17 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. TCA Fund Management Group Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against TCA Fund Management Group Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-21964

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Claimant

Lease Corporation of America

1665 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd, Ste 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendants

TCA Global Credit Fund, Ltd.

TCA Global Credit Master Fund, LP

TCA Global Credit Fund GP, Ltd.

TCA Global Credit Fund, LP.

TCA Fund Management Group Corp.

Respondent

Ocean Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew O. Schiff

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

Stephanie N. Moot

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

Claimant Attorney

Andrew Fulton, IV.

Attorney at Kelley & Fulton PA

1665 Palm Beach Lakes Boulevard, Suite 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Respondent Attorney

Martha Rosa Mora

Attorney at Avila Rodriguez Hernandez Mena & Ferri

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd., Penthouse 1225

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#38

37 #1

Affidavit

#37

#36

#35

#34

33 #2

Text of Proposed Order

33 #1

Errata A

#33

6 #1

Exhibit 1, Consents of Defendants and Relief Defendants

#4

3 #4

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Exhibit 3 - C. Lopez-Castro

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - Meland Russin Budwick

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Jonathan E. Perlman, Genovese Joblove & Battista

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #37 Amended Motion for Relief from Blanket Stay. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Amended MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM BLANKET STAY WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Lease Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Fulton, Andrew) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER denying #35 Motion for Relief from Blanket Stay. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION from Blanket Stay by Lease Corporation of America. Attorney Andrew Fulton, IV added to party Lease Corporation of America(pty:clm). (Fulton, Andrew) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER granting #33 Corrected Third Motion to Approve Retained Professionals. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Corrected MOTION for Approval of Retained Professionals by Jonathan E. Perlman. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sadovnic, Irina) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER denying #31 Third Motion to Approve Retained Professionals. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Third MOTION to Approve Retained Professionals by Jonathan E. Perlman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sadovnic, Irina) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER TO COURT ORDER by Truist. (drz) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Compliance by Non-Party Ocean Bank by Ocean Bank re #5 Order on Expedited Motion. Attorney Martha Rosa Mora added to party Ocean Bank(pty:res). (Mora, Martha) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Matthew Garno on behalf of Jonathan E. Perlman. Attorney Gregory Matthew Garno added to party Jonathan E. Perlman(pty:rc). (Garno, Gregory) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Approve Retained Professionals by Jonathan E. Perlman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sadovnic, Irina) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irina Rebeca Sadovnic on behalf of Jonathan E. Perlman. Attorney Irina Rebeca Sadovnic added to party Jonathan E. Perlman(pty:rc). (Sadovnic, Irina) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JUDGMENT of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief. Closing Case. Granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment and Notice of Partial Settlement filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Judgment and Notice of Partial Settlement by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Consents of Defendants and Relief Defendants, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moot, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Expedited Unopposed Motion and Memorandum of Law for Appointment of Receiver. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Securities and Exchange Commission (Moot, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed EXPEDITED MOTION For Appointment of Receiver by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jonathan E. Perlman, Genovese Joblove & Battista, #2 Exhibit 2 - Meland Russin Budwick, #3 Exhibit 3 - C. Lopez-Castro, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Moot, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Other Relief against TCA Fund Management Group Corp., TCA Global Credit Fund GP, Ltd., TCA Global Credit Fund, LP., TCA Global Credit Fund, Ltd., TCA Global Credit Master Fund, LP. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schiff, Andrew) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TCA Fund Management Group Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lease Corporation of America is a litigant