This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 09:16:31 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mixon

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Mixon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Scott D. Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00650

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

Todd W. Mixon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Davis Rhorer

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

777 Florida Street, Ste 208

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Andrew O. Schiff

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Ste 1950

Miami, FL 33131

Alexander H. Charap

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Ste 1950

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Considering the #6 Notice of Related Proceedings filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, the clerk shall administratively terminate this action in his record, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/28/2020. (SWE) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Securities and Exchange Commission (Schiff, Andrew) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/14/2020. (KAH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. All Defendants. (Rhorer, Davis) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Todd W. Mixon. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance for Attorneys representing United States by Securities and Exchange Commission (Rhorer, Davis) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

1 #2

Summons - Todd Mixon

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Todd W. Mixon, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Todd Mixon)(Rhorer, Davis) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Considering the #6 Notice of Related Proceedings filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, the clerk shall administratively terminate this action in his record, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/28/2020. (SWE) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Securities and Exchange Commission (Schiff, Andrew) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/14/2020. (KAH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. All Defendants. (Rhorer, Davis) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Todd W. Mixon. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance for Attorneys representing United States by Securities and Exchange Commission (Rhorer, Davis) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Todd W. Mixon, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Todd Mixon)(Rhorer, Davis) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less