This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:20:16 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Iconix Brand Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Iconix Brand Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11150

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

Iconix Brand Group Incorporated

Iconix Brand Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah Heaton Concannon

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission (DC)

100 F Street, N.E.

Washington, DC 20549

Thomas A Bednar

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission

100 F Street Ne

Washington, NY 20549

Fernando Campoamor Sanchez

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street Ne, Ste 5924

Washington Dc, DC 20549

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT ICONIX BRAND GROUP, INC.: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is liable for a civil penalty in the amount of $5,500,000.00 pursuant to Section 21(d)(3) of the Exchange Act [15 U.S.C. 78u(d)(3)] and Section 20(d) of the Securities Act [15 U.S.C. 77t(d)]. Defendant shall satisfy this obligation by paying $5,500,000.00 to the Securities and Exchange Commission pursuant to the terms of the payment schedule set forth in paragraph VI below after entry of this Final Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Final Judgment. And as set forth herein., Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Thomas Anthony Bednar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, #4 MOTION for Fernando Campoamor Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, #6 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to Iconix Brand Group, Inc. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/10/2019) (ama) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/9/2019) (ks) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

3 #1

Affidavit

#3

(#3) MOTION for Thomas Anthony Bednar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Virginia), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bednar, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bednar, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

4 #2

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Heaton Concannon on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Concannon, Sarah) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to Iconix Brand Group, Inc.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent of Iconix Brand Group, Inc., #2 Exhibit B: Proposed Judgment as to Iconix Brand Group, Inc.)(Concannon, Sarah) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

3 #3

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Virginia)

3 #4

Text of Proposed Order

6 #2

Exhibit B: Proposed Judgment as to Iconix Brand Group, Inc.

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Iconix Brand Group Incorporated. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Bednar, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit A: Consent of Iconix Brand Group, Inc.

4 #1

Declaration and Certificate

3 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 10 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kv) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 9 TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kv) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT ICONIX BRAND GROUP, INC.: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is liable for a civil penalty in the amount of $5,500,000.00 pursuant to Section 21(d)(3) of the Exchange Act [15 U.S.C. 78u(d)(3)] and Section 20(d) of the Securities Act [15 U.S.C. 77t(d)]. Defendant shall satisfy this obligation by paying $5,500,000.00 to the Securities and Exchange Commission pursuant to the terms of the payment schedule set forth in paragraph VI below after entry of this Final Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Final Judgment. And as set forth herein., Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Thomas Anthony Bednar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, #4 MOTION for Fernando Campoamor Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, #6 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to Iconix Brand Group, Inc. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/10/2019) (ama) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/9/2019) (ks) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to Iconix Brand Group, Inc.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent of Iconix Brand Group, Inc., #2 Exhibit B: Proposed Judgment as to Iconix Brand Group, Inc.)(Concannon, Sarah) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas A Bednar. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Iconix Brand Group, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas A Bednar. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff); County code Albany; Fee Status code pd (paid);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Heaton Concannon on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Concannon, Sarah) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Fernando Campoamor Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #3 MOTION for Thomas Anthony Bednar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Fernando Campoamor Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Certificate, #2 Proposed Order)(Campoamor Sanchez, Fernando) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Thomas Anthony Bednar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Virginia), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bednar, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bednar, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Iconix Brand Group Incorporated. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Bednar, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.