This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2020 at 09:16:48 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hopkins

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Hopkins. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda V. Parker and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11980

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant

Mark L. Hopkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah E. Hancur

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

175 W. Jackson Blvd, Suite 1450

Chicago, IL 60604

John E. Birkenheier

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

175 W. Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1450

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorney

Kyle R. Riem

8137 Embury Road, Unit 1

Grand Blanc, MI 48439

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Mark L. Hopkins waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Hancur, Sarah) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kyle R. Riem appearing on behalf of Mark L. Hopkins (Riem, Kyle) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Birkenheier on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Birkenheier, John) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Mark L. Hopkins* (TTho) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Securities and Exchange Commission against Mark L. Hopkins with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hancur, Sarah) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah E Hancur

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John E. Birkenheier