This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2020 at 08:07:56 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Dropil Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Dropil Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00793

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

Patrick O'Hara

Zachary Matar

Dropil Inc.

Jeremy McAlpine

Patrick O Hara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Oren Blau

Attorney at US Securities and Exchange Commission

444 South Flower Street Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jacob A Regenstreif

Attorney at US Securities and Exchange Commission

444 South Flower Street Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Waiver of Service Executed re Zachary Matar

11 #1

Waiver of Service Executed re Jeremy McAlpine

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Dropil Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020; Zachary Matar waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020; Jeremy McAlpine waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Rafael Yakobi. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Executed re Jeremy McAlpine, #2 Waiver of Service Executed re Zachary Matar)(Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Patrick O Hara. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Zachary Matar. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jeremy McAlpine. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dropil Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

3 #3

Summons to Patrick O'Hara

3 #2

Summons to Zachary Matar

3 #1

Summons to Jeremy McAlpine

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Jeremy McAlpine, #2 Summons to Zachary Matar, #3 Summons to Patrick O'Hara)(Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Daniel Oren Blau added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Patrick O Hara waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Andrew Silver. (Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Dropil Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020; Zachary Matar waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020; Jeremy McAlpine waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Rafael Yakobi. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Executed re Jeremy McAlpine, #2 Waiver of Service Executed re Zachary Matar)(Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Patrick O Hara. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Zachary Matar. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jeremy McAlpine. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dropil Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Jeremy McAlpine, #2 Summons to Zachary Matar, #3 Summons to Patrick O'Hara)(Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Daniel Oren Blau added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Oren Blau