This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/02/2020 at 09:16:12 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Debo

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Debo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

Ulrik Debo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Peter Berger

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission (NY)

200 Vesey Street, Ste. 400

New York, NY 10281

Judith Ann Weinstock

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

Kristine Mary Zaleskas

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission (3 WFC)

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

Paul G. Gizzi

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/6/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul G. Gizzi on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Gizzi, Paul) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristine Mary Zaleskas on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Zaleskas, Kristine) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Peter Berger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff). (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ulrik Debo. (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Ann Weinstock on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Weinstock, Judith) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ulrik Debo, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Berger, Marc) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Berger, Marc) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ulrik Debo. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Berger, Marc) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristine Mary Zaleskas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul G. Gizzi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Peter Berger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Judith A. Weinstock Esq.