This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2020 at 09:10:24 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Dang

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Dang. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey A. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01353

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey A. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

Hai-Khoa Dang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David H. London

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

33 Arch Street, 24Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

John B. Hughes

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

157 Church St., 25Th Floor

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

10 #4

Affidavit Declaration of Robert S. Latham

10 #3

Affidavit Declaration of Mark Albers

10 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment

10 #1

Memorandum in Support

#10

(#10) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hai Khoa Dang by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Albers, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Robert S. Latham)(London, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

8 #1

Affidavit Declaration of David H. London, Esq.

#8

(#8) MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Hai Khoa Dang by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David H. London, Esq.)(London, David) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Hai-Khoa Dang served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (London, David) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hai-Khoa Dang* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David H. London* *Securities and Exchange Commission Boston Regional Office* *33 Arch Street 24th Floor* *Boston, MA 02110*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Securities and Exchange Commission Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2020 Discovery due by 3/12/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2021 Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HAI KHOA DANG, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(London, David) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hai Khoa Dang by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Albers, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Robert S. Latham)(London, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTRY (Doc. #8 ). Plaintiff has filed a motion for default entry (Doc. #8 ) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) on the ground that defendant has been properly served but failed to appear or otherwise participate in this action. The Court GRANTS the motion for default entry. Plaintiff shall file on or before 21 days from now any motion for default judgment and with any affidavits or other materials that may be necessary to substantiate the complaint's claim for damages and the award of any costs or fees. See City of New York v. Mickalas Pawn Shop, LLC, 645 F.3d 113, 128 (2d Cir. 2011). Defendant shall have 10 days thereafter from the date of plaintiff's motion for default judgment to file any objection or response. In the absence of a timely response (or motion for extension of time), the Court is likely to grant any properly supported motion for default judgment and to enter final judgment against defendant in this action. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/15/2020. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Hai Khoa Dang by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David H. London, Esq.)(London, David) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Hai-Khoa Dang served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (London, David) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hai-Khoa Dang* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David H. London* *Securities and Exchange Commission Boston Regional Office* *33 Arch Street 24th Floor* *Boston, MA 02110*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Securities and Exchange Commission Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2020 Discovery due by 3/12/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2021 Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to HAI KHOA DANG. (London, David) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HAI KHOA DANG, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(London, David) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID H. LONDON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John B. Hughes