This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2020 at 08:43:50 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Church-Koegel et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Church-Koegel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-21001

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

Nicole J Walker

Marina Del Ray, CA 90292

Brook Church-Koegel

Marina Del Ray, CA 90292

David H Goldman

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christine Nestor

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

Stephanie N. Moot

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#25

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#24

#21

#17

#16

#15

#10

#8

#5

#6

#4

#3

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear specially appear to contest the validity of service of process in this matter., #17 Response/Reply (Other) of Brook Church Koegel and Nicole J. Walker by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Nestor, Christine) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Plaintiff's MOTION to Set Aside Default Against Defendants Brook Church Koegel and Nicole J. Walker by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nestor, Christine) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) re 22 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants 21 Defendant Nicole J. Walker's motion to specially appear to contest the validity of service of process in this matter. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission is ordered to respond to 21 the letter filed by the Defendant on or before May 4, 2020. The Clerk is directed to e-mail copies of the docket entries in this matter, including this Order, to Defendant Walker at onenicolewalker@gmail.com and to mail same to the Defendant at 13603 Marina Pointe Drive, Apt. D403, Marina Del Rey, CA 90292. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn) *sent to onenicolewalker@gmail.com*. (ail) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #21 Defendant Nicole J. Walker's motion to specially appear to contest the validity of service of process in this matter. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission is ordered to respond to #21 the letter filed by the Defendant on or before May 4, 2020. The Clerk is directed to e-mail copies of the docket entries in this matter, including this Order, to Defendant Walker at onenicolewalker@gmail.com and to mail same to the Defendant at 13603 Marina Pointe Drive, Apt. D403, Marina Del Rey, CA 90292. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION/ Leave for permission to specially appear to contest the validity of service of process in this matter by Nicole J Walker re DE #10 . Responses due by 5/4/2020 (amb) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) re 18 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #17 Defendant Brook Church-Koegel's motion to specially appear to contest the validity of service of process in this matter. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission is ordered to respond to #17 the letter filed by the Defendant on or before May 1, 2020. The Clerk is directed to e-mail copies of the docket entries in this matter, including this Order, to Defendant Church-Koegel at brookck@gmail.com and to mail same to the Defendant at 13904 Fiji Way #341, Marina Del Rey, CA 90292. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. *sent to brookck@gmail.com per Court Order* (ail) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) re 18 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants 17 Defendant Brook Church-Koegel's motion to specially appear to contest the validity of service of process in this matter. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission is ordered to respond to 17 the letter filed by the Defendant on or before May 1, 2020. The Clerk is directed to e-mail copies of the docket entries in this matter, including this Order, to Defendant Church-Koegel at brookck@gmail.com and to mail same to the Defendant at 13904 Fiji Way #341, Marina Del Rey, CA 90292. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. **sent to brookck@gmail.com per Court Order** (ail) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #17 Defendant Brook Church-Koegel's motion to specially appear to contest the validity of service of process in this matter. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission is ordered to respond to #17 the letter filed by the Defendant on or before May 1, 2020. The Clerk is directed to e-mail copies of the docket entries in this matter, including this Order, to Defendant Church-Koegel at brookck@gmail.com and to mail same to the Defendant at 13904 Fiji Way #341, Marina Del Rey, CA 90292. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Objection to Service of Process re #8 Summons Returned Executed, by Brook Church-Koegel. (amb) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #15 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Brook Church-Koegel, Nicole J Walker. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Securities and Exchange Commission. Nicole J Walker served on 3/14/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Nestor, Christine) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Securities and Exchange Commission. David H Goldman served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Nestor, Christine) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Securities and Exchange Commission. Brook Church-Koegel served on 3/14/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Nestor, Christine) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 3/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres per DE #5 Order Referring Discovery Matters. (vjk) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Securities and Exchange Commission (Nestor, Christine) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Brook Church-Koegel, David H Goldman, Nicole J Walker. (pcs) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Nestor, Christine) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine Nestor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie N Moot