This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2021 at 11:18:45 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Brothers Investment Group International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Brothers Investment Group International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are K. Michael Moore and Lauren Fleischer Louis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24842

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

K. Michael Moore

Referral Judge

Lauren Fleischer Louis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

Brothers Investment Group International, Inc.

Anson Jean-Pierre

Brothers International Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie N. Moot

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

Ryszard Bolko

Attorney at law office of ryszard bolko pllc

1825 Nw Corporate Blvd, Suite 110

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

#6

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

proposed order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Response to the Plaintiff's Complaint. #8 . Therein, Defendants request a twenty (20) day enlargement of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to allow for a thorough review of Defendants' records. Id. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Response to the Plaintiff's Complaint #8 is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 14, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/21/2021. (hwr) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing of Unopposed Proposed Order by Brothers Investment Group International, Inc., Anson Jean-Pierre re #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer (Attachments: #1 proposed order) (Bolko, Ryszard) Modified text on 1/21/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Brothers Investment Group International, Inc., Anson Jean-Pierre. Attorney Ryszard Bolko added to party Brothers Investment Group International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ryszard Bolko added to party Anson Jean-Pierre(pty:dft). (Bolko, Ryszard) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Anson Jean-Pierre waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Moot, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Brothers Investment Group International, Inc. waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Moot, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAUREN FLEISCHER LOUIS. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis' discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/25/2020. (hwr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/25/2020. (hwr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Brothers Investment Group International, Inc., Anson Jean-Pierre. (jbs) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Other Relief against Brothers Investment Group International, Inc., Anson Jean-Pierre. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Moot, Stephanie) Modified docket text on 11/24/2020 (jua). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie N Moot