This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2019 at 07:49:55 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Beam

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Beam. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06458

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

Marcus Beam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John E Birkenheier

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission

175 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1450

Chicago, IL 60604-2601

AUSA - Chicago

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Patrick R Costello

100 F Street N.E.

Washington, DC 20549-5985

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Declaration of Patrick R. Costello

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Patrick R Costello for presentment of motion for entry of default #8 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/3/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Costello, Patrick) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission for entry of default (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick R. Costello)(Costello, Patrick) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Marcus Beam on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Costello, Patrick) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission by Patrick R Costello (Costello, Patrick) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Patrick Reinhold Costello's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #4 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/3/2019. Mailed notice (rp, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission for leave to appear as Pro Hac Vice (Costello, Patrick) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Marcus Beam (mc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission by John E Birkenheier (Birkenheier, John) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Birkenheier, John) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Securities and Exchange Commission; Jury Demand. (Birkenheier, John) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Reinhold Costello

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John E. Birkenheier