This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2021 at 09:42:57 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bauman

Case Summary

On September 8, 2021, the United States Securities and Exchange Commission (the “SEC” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Eric Forni, Kathleen Shields, and Nita Kumaraswam Klunder, attorneys at SEC’s New York regional office, filed a civil enforcement action against Frederick Bauman (“Bauman” or “Defendant”). Plaintiff filed suit seeking injunctive relief and disgorgement of all ill-gotten gains along with pre-judgement interest for the alleged misleading opinion letter of the Defendant. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the District of Nevada.

In the complaint Plaintiff alleged that, “Bauman, a licensed attorney who specialized in securities law and securities transactions, was a necessary participant and substantial factor in sales of securities of public companies under circumstances where the sales were legally required to be registered with the SEC but they were not. This complaint focuses on his actions with respect to the stock of four public companies between 2016 and 2019. As an attorney, Bauman authored at least a dozen attorney opinion letters stating his view that securities owned by certain shareholders of those four public companies could be freely traded to investors in the public markets. These opinion letters were misleading in certain ways. In fact, the securities owned by these shareholders were not freely tradeable and Bauman’s opinion letters facilitated the unregistered sales of securities by these shareholders.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Bauman’s clients, on whose behalf he wrote the opinion letters, were actually part of groups that controlled the companies whose stock they owned (“Control Groups”), and because of this they were “affiliates” of the companies under the securities laws enforced by the SEC. Bauman’s misleading opinion letters enabled his Control Group clients illegally to sell their shares in violation of federal securities laws. Bauman’s opinion letters falsely represented that the shareholders on whose behalf he was writing were not “affiliates” of the companies whose stock they owned. Bauman sent those letters to transfer agents – entities that record the ownership and transfer of securities, and thus routinely track whether particular securities are subject to resale restrictions.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Bauman knew that the purpose of his letters was for the transfer agents to treat the stock as unrestricted, and record transfers on that basis. But for Bauman’s opinion letters, the transfer agent would not have issued the stock without a restrictive legend. Bauman’s letters thereby facilitated his clients’ illegal stock sales. Bauman’s opinion letters facilitated the dumping of at least the securities of EnviroTechnologies International, Inc. (“EnviroTechnologies”; Ticker: ETII), Cyberfort Software, Inc. (“Cyberfort”; Ticker: CYBF), Blake Insomnia Therapeutics, Inc. (“Blake”; Ticker: BKIT), and Sandy Steele Unlimited Inc. (“Sandy Steele”; Ticker: SSTU).”

There is only one claim for relief laid down by Plaintiff which deals with the alleged unregistered offer and sale of securities in violations of Sections 5(a) and 5(c) of the Securities Act.

In its prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court for a judgment in a form consistent with Rule 65(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to enjoin Bauman from directly or indirectly providing, or receiving compensation from the provision of professional legal services to any person or entity in connection with the offer or sale of securities. Plaintiff also requested the court to order Bauman to pay a civil penalty under Section 20(d) of the Securities Act and to disgorge all ill-gotten gains with prejudgment interest.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01651

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

Frederick Bauman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nita Kumaraswami Klunder

Eric Forni

Kathleen Shields

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Proposed Order

3 #2

Exhibit

#5

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Admit Government Attorney. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Admit Government Attorney. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Admit Government Attorney. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Admit Government Attorney. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Kathleen Shields by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Klunder, Nita) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Complaint. Attorney Kathleen Shields and Eric Forni do not appear to be admitted to this court. Attorney's advised to complete the process to be admitted to this court. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION for Judgment by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Klunder, Nita) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Nita Klunder by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Klunder, Nita) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Frederick Bauman by Securities and Exchange Commission. Proof of service due by 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klunder, Nita) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less