This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:46:01 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Armbruster et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Armbruster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela Pepper and Lynn Adelman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00481

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Pamela Pepper

Lynn Adelman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendants

Bret Naggs

Mark Wogsland

Peter Armbruster

Intervenor

United States Department of Justice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy S Leiman

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

175 W Jackson Blvd - Ste 1450

Chicago, IL 60604

Aleah Borghard

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

175 W Jackson Blvd - Ste 1450

Chicago, IL 60604

Bradley N Lewis

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

175 W Jackson Blvd - Ste 1450

Chicago, IL 60604

Brian D Fagel

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

175 W Jackson Blvd - Ste 1450

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Steven M Biskupic

Attorney at Biskupic & Jacobs SC

1045 W Glen Oaks Ln - Ste 106

Mequon, WI 53092

Michelle L Jacobs

Attorney at Biskupic & Jacobs SC

1045 W Glen Oaks Ln - Ste 106

Mequon, WI 53092

Vanessa K Eisenmann

Attorney at Biskupic & Jacobs SC

1045 W Glen Oaks Ln - Ste 106

Mequon, WI 53092

Junaid A Zubairi

Attorney at Vedder Price PC

222 N Lasalle St - Ste 2600

Chicago, IL 60601

Jonathon P Reinisch

Attorney at Vedder Price PC

222 N Lasalle St - Ste 2600

Chicago, IL 60601

Ryan S Hedges

Attorney at Vedder Price PC

222 N Lasalle St - Ste 2600

Chicago, IL 60601

Andrew R DeVooght

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 N Clark St - Ste 2300

Chicago, IL 60654

C Linna Chen

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

345 Park Ave

New York, NY 10154-0037

Intervenor Attorney

Caitlin R Cottingham

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (DC)

1400 New York Ave Nw - 10Th Fl

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/28/19 granting #19 Motion to Stay. (cc: all counsel) (jad)

#22

(#22) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/28/19 granting #21 Motion to Intervene. (cc: all counsel) (jad)

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#21

(#21) Unopposed MOTION to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Joining Motion to Stay SEC Proceedings Pending Entry of Final Judgment in Parallel Criminal Case by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottingham, Caitlin)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin R Cottingham on behalf of United States Department of Justice. Attorney(s) appearing: Caitlin R. Cottingham (Cottingham, Caitlin)

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION to Stay SEC PROCEEDING PENDING OUTCOME OF PARALLEL CRIMINAL CASE by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Biskupic, Steven)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley N Lewis on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney(s) appearing: Brad Lewis (Lewis, Bradley)

#17

(#17) DISCLOSURE Statement by Mark Wogsland. (Hedges, Ryan)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by C Linna Chen on behalf of Peter Armbruster. Attorney(s) appearing: C. Linna Chen (Chen, C)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R DeVooght on behalf of Peter Armbruster. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew R. DeVooght (DeVooght, Andrew)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/4/2019. Judge Pamela Pepper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa K Eisenmann on behalf of Bret Naggs. Attorney(s) appearing: Vanessa K. Eisenmann (Eisenmann, Vanessa)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L Jacobs on behalf of Bret Naggs. Attorney(s) appearing: Michelle L. Jacobs (Jacobs, Michelle)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Biskupic on behalf of Bret Naggs. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven M. Biskupic (Biskupic, Steven)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Leiman on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy S. Leiman (Leiman, Timothy)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Peter Armbruster, Bret Naggs, Mark Wogsland by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leiman, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/28/19 granting #19 Motion to Stay. (cc: all counsel) (jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/28/19 granting #21 Motion to Intervene. (cc: all counsel) (jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Unopposed MOTION to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Joining Motion to Stay SEC Proceedings Pending Entry of Final Judgment in Parallel Criminal Case by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottingham, Caitlin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin R Cottingham on behalf of United States Department of Justice. Attorney(s) appearing: Caitlin R. Cottingham (Cottingham, Caitlin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Unopposed MOTION to Stay SEC PROCEEDING PENDING OUTCOME OF PARALLEL CRIMINAL CASE by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Biskupic, Steven)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley N Lewis on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney(s) appearing: Brad Lewis (Lewis, Bradley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DISCLOSURE Statement by Mark Wogsland. (Hedges, Ryan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DISCLOSURE Statement by Bret Naggs. (Eisenmann, Vanessa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DISCLOSURE Statement by Peter Armbruster. (DeVooght, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bret Naggs - Waiver sent on 4/3/2019. (Jacobs, Michelle)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon P Reinisch on behalf of Mark Wogsland. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathon P. Reinisch (Reinisch, Jonathon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by C Linna Chen on behalf of Peter Armbruster. Attorney(s) appearing: C. Linna Chen (Chen, C)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R DeVooght on behalf of Peter Armbruster. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew R. DeVooght (DeVooght, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/4/2019. Judge Pamela Pepper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa K Eisenmann on behalf of Bret Naggs. Attorney(s) appearing: Vanessa K. Eisenmann (Eisenmann, Vanessa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L Jacobs on behalf of Bret Naggs. Attorney(s) appearing: Michelle L. Jacobs (Jacobs, Michelle)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Biskupic on behalf of Bret Naggs. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven M. Biskupic (Biskupic, Steven)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (ds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Leiman on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy S. Leiman (Leiman, Timothy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Peter Armbruster, Bret Naggs, Mark Wogsland by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leiman, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.