This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2021 at 08:32:41 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Abhi Batra

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Abhi Batra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar, Dean D. Pregerson and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00434

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judges

Dean D. Pregerson

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

Abhi Batra

Abhimanyu Batra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah S. Nilson

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

444 S. Flower Street, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John B Bulgozdy

Attorney at US Securities and Exchange Commission

444 South Flower Street Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Sarah S Nilson

Attorney at US Securities and Exchange Commission

444 South Flower Street Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Abhi Batra in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. AMENDED (Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00434-GW (ASx). (aco) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Abhi Batra answer now due 2/25/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.(Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Abhi Batra served on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Abhi Batra in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Abhi Batra. (esa) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney John B Bulgozdy added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Abhi Batra filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration JOHN B. BULGOZDY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT) (Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Abhi Batra in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. AMENDED (Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00434-GW (ASx). (aco) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Abhi Batra answer now due 2/25/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.(Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Abhi Batra served on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Abhi Batra in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #6 e-mailed to Sarah S. Nilson at nilson@sec.gov bounced due to Typo in email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to nilsons@sec.gov. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Abhi Batra. (esa) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney John B Bulgozdy added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Bulgozdy, John) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John B Bulgozdy