This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2019 at 07:20:48 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Tsai

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Tsai. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07501

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Securities and Exchange Commisison

200 Vesey St., Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

Bill Tsai

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melanie Anne MacLean

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

Simona K. Suh

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission(NYC)

3 World Financial Center, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 9, 2019 is adjourned to January 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's August 29, 2019 order are due no later than January 2, 2020. The parties are directed to submit a joint status letter regarding the status of their settlement efforts by no later than November 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.). (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/1/19) (yv) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#8

(#8) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and deadlines set forth in the Courts Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Melanie A. MacLean dated September 27, 2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Woods Individual Rules served on Bill Tsai on September 12, 2019. Service was accepted by Carolina A. Fornos, Esq. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bill Tsai waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/29/2019) (anc) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simona K. Suh on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Suh, Simona) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (MacLean, Melanie) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bill Tsai. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison.(MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 9, 2019 is adjourned to January 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's August 29, 2019 order are due no later than January 2, 2020. The parties are directed to submit a joint status letter regarding the status of their settlement efforts by no later than November 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.). (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/1/19) (yv) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and deadlines set forth in the Courts Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Melanie A. MacLean dated September 27, 2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Woods Individual Rules served on Bill Tsai on September 12, 2019. Service was accepted by Carolina A. Fornos, Esq. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bill Tsai waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/29/2019) (anc) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simona K. Suh on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Suh, Simona) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Melanie Anne MacLean. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Securities and Exchange Commission. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Melanie Anne MacLean to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (MacLean, Melanie) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bill Tsai. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison.(MacLean, Melanie) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Securities and Exchange Commisison is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMONA K. SUH