This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/20/2020 at 10:17:25 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commisison v. TCA Fund Management Group Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Securities and Exchange Commisison filed an Other lawsuit against TCA Fund Management Group Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-MC-00055

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commisison

Defendants

TCA Global Credit Fund, LTD.

TCA Global Credit Master Fund, LP

TCA Global Credit Fund GP, LTD.

TCA Fund Management Group Corp.

TCA Global Credit Fund, LP

Receiver

Jonathan E. Perlman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Schiff

Attorney at US Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

Stephanie N Moot

Attorney at US Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S UNOPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER by United States District Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (car) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER by United States District Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Receiver, Jonathan E. Perlman's Emergency Motion to Confirm and Expand Receivership [ECF No. 15], filed on May 15, 2020. Being fully advised, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED. (car) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF by United States District Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (car) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER RELIEF Re: 1:20-cv-21964-CMA from USDC Southern District of Florida, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commisison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) Modified on 5/22/2020 (car). (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TCA Fund Management Group Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Securities and Exchange Commisison is a litigant

Latest cases where TCA Global Credit Master Fund, LP, is a litigant