This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 09:16:18 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commisison v. Bajic et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Securities and Exchange Commisison filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Bajic. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commisison

33 Arch St., 24Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Defendants

SSID Ltd.

Kenneth Ciapala

Sure Mighty Ltd.

Tamarind Investments, Inc.

Crystalmount Ltd.

Aaron Dale Wise

Island Fortune Global Ltd.

Fountain Drive Ltd.

Norfolk Heights Ltd.

Anthony Killarney

Blacklight SA

Steve M. Bajic

Wisdom Chain Ltd.

Rajesh Taneja

Christopher Lee McKnight

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alicia Marie Reed

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

Kathleen B. Shields

Attorney at Choate, Hall & Stewart, LLP

Two International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Rebecca Israel

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

33 Arch Street, Ste 24Th Floor

Boston, MA 02446

 

Court Documents

58 #1

Exhibit Update on Service of Process

#58

(#58) LETTER MOTION to Continue Initial Pre-Trial Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Plaintiff, Securities and Exchange Commission dated 2/27/20. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Update on Service of Process).(Israel, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#57

(#57) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Aaron Dale Wise served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Service was accepted by Ben Gilkey as co-resident. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Shields, Kathleen) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#56

(#56) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Israel on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Israel, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#54

(#54) STIPULATION AND ORDER FREEZING ASSETS AS TO DEFENDANT STEVE M. BARC: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED AND ORDERED that: A. Defendant Bajic, and each of his, agents, servants, employees and attorneys and those persons in active concert or participation with him who receive actual notice of this Stipulation and Order by personal service or otherwise, including facsimile transmission, electronic mail, or overnight delivery service, shall hold and retain the funds held by Bajic, or for his direct or indirect benefit, or under his direct or indirect control in the following accounts, and shall prevent any withdrawal, sale, payment (including, but not limited to, any charges on any credit card or draws on any other credit arrangement), transfer, dissipation, assignment, pledge, alienation, encumbrance, disposal, or diminution in value of any such funds or other assets, which are hereby frozen (As further set forth in this Order.) Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, this Order shall remain in effect until entry of a Final Judgment as to Defendant Bajic or other final disposition of this action as to him. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/30/2020) (cf) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing. (Entered: 01/30/2020)

53 #3

Text of Proposed Order

53 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

53 #1

Affidavit of Rebecca Israel

#53

(#53) MOTION for Rebecca Israel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rebecca Israel, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#52

(#52) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison. (Shields, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#51

(#51) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #50 Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. As stated below, the SEC shall file the proposed asset freeze order by January 29, 2020. Until Defendant Bajic appears, Defendant's substantive arguments made to the Court will not be considered, unless Defendant justifies how extraordinary circumstances or legal authority require that his arguments be considered, notwithstanding his nonappearance. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/22/2020) (kv) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Steve M. Bajic, Blacklight SA, Kenneth Ciapala, Crystalmount Ltd., Fountain Drive Ltd., Island Fortune Global Ltd., Anthony Killarney, Christopher Lee McKnight, Norfolk Heights Ltd., SSID Ltd., Sure Mighty Ltd., Tamarind Investments, Inc., Rajesh Taneja, Wisdom Chain Ltd., Aaron Dale Wise. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison.(Reed, Alicia) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

3 #3

Text of Proposed Order

3 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

3 #1

Affidavit

#3

>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 MOTION for Kathleen Burdette Shields to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reed, Alicia) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alicia Marie Reed to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the party/parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) LETTER MOTION to Continue Initial Pre-Trial Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Plaintiff, Securities and Exchange Commission dated 2/27/20. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Update on Service of Process).(Israel, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Aaron Dale Wise served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Service was accepted by Ben Gilkey as co-resident. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Shields, Kathleen) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Israel on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Israel, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER granting #53 Motion for Rebecca Israel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) STIPULATION AND ORDER FREEZING ASSETS AS TO DEFENDANT STEVE M. BARC: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED AND ORDERED that: A. Defendant Bajic, and each of his, agents, servants, employees and attorneys and those persons in active concert or participation with him who receive actual notice of this Stipulation and Order by personal service or otherwise, including facsimile transmission, electronic mail, or overnight delivery service, shall hold and retain the funds held by Bajic, or for his direct or indirect benefit, or under his direct or indirect control in the following accounts, and shall prevent any withdrawal, sale, payment (including, but not limited to, any charges on any credit card or draws on any other credit arrangement), transfer, dissipation, assignment, pledge, alienation, encumbrance, disposal, or diminution in value of any such funds or other assets, which are hereby frozen (As further set forth in this Order.) Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, this Order shall remain in effect until entry of a Final Judgment as to Defendant Bajic or other final disposition of this action as to him. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/30/2020) (cf) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing. (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Rebecca Israel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION for Rebecca Israel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rebecca Israel, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison. (Shields, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #50 Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. As stated below, the SEC shall file the proposed asset freeze order by January 29, 2020. Until Defendant Bajic appears, Defendant's substantive arguments made to the Court will not be considered, unless Defendant justifies how extraordinary circumstances or legal authority require that his arguments be considered, notwithstanding his nonappearance. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/22/2020) (kv) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kathleen Shields dated January 21, 2020 re: response to Court Order, Docket No. 46. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison.(Shields, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Steve M. Bajic, Blacklight SA, Kenneth Ciapala, Crystalmount Ltd., Fountain Drive Ltd., Island Fortune Global Ltd., Anthony Killarney, Christopher Lee McKnight, Norfolk Heights Ltd., SSID Ltd., Sure Mighty Ltd., Tamarind Investments, Inc., Rajesh Taneja, Wisdom Chain Ltd., Aaron Dale Wise. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison.(Reed, Alicia) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alicia Marie Reed to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the party/parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alicia Marie Reed. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Fee Status code pd (paid). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived). (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 MOTION for Kathleen Burdette Shields to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Kathleen Burdette Shields to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Alicia) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reed, Alicia) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison.(Reed, Alicia) Modified on 1/3/2020 (pne). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Securities and Exchange Commisison is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia Marie Reed

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Israel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen Burdette Shields