This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2020 at 08:23:49 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commisison v. Ackerman

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Securities and Exchange Commisison filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Ackerman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01181

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commisison

Defendant

Michael W Ackerman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amie Berlin

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Ave, Ste 1950

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michael W Ackerman served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. Service was accepted by Michael W. Ackerman. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Berlin, Amie) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael W Ackerman..(pc) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berlin, Amie) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael W. Ackerman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Berlin, Amie) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Amie Berlin to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Amie Berlin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Securities and Exchange Commisison. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Amie Berlin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Amie Berlin to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption; the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael W. Ackerman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Berlin, Amie) Modified on 2/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berlin, Amie) Modified on 2/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael W Ackerman. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Berlin, Amie) Modified on 2/12/2020 (jgo). Modified on 2/12/2020 (pc). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Securities and Exchange Commisison is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amie Riggle Berlin