This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2021 at 12:26:40 (UTC).

Securities and Exchange Commision v. Jimenez, Jr

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Securities and Exchange Commision filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Jimenez, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01682

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Securities and Exchange Commision

Defendant

Eugenio Garcia Jimenez, Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean Michael O'Neill

Attorney at United States Securities & Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

Stephanie N. Moot

Attorney at United States Securities & Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1950

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

Jose M. Martinez-Chevres

Attorney at MARTINEZ CHEVRES LAW OFFICE

Po Box 190790

San Juan, PR 00919-0790

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #3

Summons

#3

3 #1

Summons

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Jose M. Martinez-Chevres on behalf of Defendant Eugenio Garcia Jimenez, Jr.(Martinez-Chevres, Jose) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The motion for extension of time to answer the complaint at ECF No. 8 is GRANTED as requested. Answer deadline due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/11/2021. (wm) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion Extension of Time to Answer or, Otherwise Plead filed by Securities and Exchange Commision Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Eugenio Garcia Jimenez, Jr filed by Securities and Exchange Commision. (O'Neill, Sean) Modified caps on 1/4/2021 (idg). (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Jose M. Martinez-Chevres on behalf of Eugenio Garcia Jimenez, Jr Responses due by 1/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Chevres, Jose) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jose M. Martinez-Chevres on behalf of Eugenio Garcia Jimenez, Jr (Martinez-Chevres, Jose) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commision upon Eugenio Garcia Jimenez, Jr served on 12/8/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (O'Neill, Sean) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#5) ***FILED IN ERROR*** MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (Docket No. 4), this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Signed by Clerk on 12/02/2020. (gr) Modified on 12/2/2020 as to filed in error (gr). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#4) ***FILED IN ERROR*** ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned disqualifies herself from participation in the case at bar. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/2/2020.(wm) Modified on 12/2/2020 as to filed in error (gr). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Eugenio Garcia Jimenez, Jr (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Eugenio Garcia Jimenez, Jr, filed by Securities and Exchange Commision. Service due by 3/1/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(O'Neill, Sean) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Securities and Exchange Commisison is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie N Moot