This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2023 at 10:14:54 (UTC).

Secured Tents LLC v. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 Secured Tents LLC filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Secured Tents, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Flexx Productions

Defendants

XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.

Coyote Logistics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jody Nicholas Duvall

Attorney at Coan Payton & Payne, LLC

103 West Mountain Avenue, Suite 200

Fort Collins, CO 80524

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Michael Murphy

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr.

Attorney at Kissinger & Fellman, P.C.

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Ptarmigan Place

Denver, CO 80209

Jonathan Marshall Abramson

Attorney at Kissinger & Fellman, P.C.

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Ptarmigan Place

Denver, CO 80209

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6 March 2023. IT IS ORDERED that I recuse myself from further service in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall reassign this civil action to another Judge of this Court.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference currently set on April 12, 2023 at is vacated. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Coyote Logistics LLC.(Riley, Bobby) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Timothy Michael Murphy added to party XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.(pty:dft) by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc..(Murphy, Timothy) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

9 #1

Affidavit of Service

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Secured Tents, LLC. Coyote Logistics LLC served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/22/2023; XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Duvall, Jody) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#8

(#8) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 27 January 2023. For good cause shown, the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #6 is granted. Defendant Coyote Logistics LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 22, 2023. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Coyote Logistics LLC. Coyote Logistics LLC answer due 2/22/2023. (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#5

(#5) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 January 2023. Consent Form due by 3/30/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/5/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

1 #9

Summons for Coyote

1 #8

Summons for XPO

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Coyote Logistics LLC, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8870915)Attorney Jody Nicholas Duvall added to party Secured Tents LLC dba Flexx Productions(pty:pla), filed by Secured Tents LLC dba Flexx Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons for XPO, #9 Summons for Coyote)(Duvall, Jody) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER This Matter is before the Court upon its reassignment to Magistrate Judge Varholak. The deadlines set by #5 Minute Order are VACATED. The Court will issue an order resetting the relevant deadlines. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/6/2023. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00043-STV. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6 March 2023. IT IS ORDERED that I recuse myself from further service in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall reassign this civil action to another Judge of this Court.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference currently set on April 12, 2023 at is vacated. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Coyote Logistics LLC.(Riley, Bobby) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Timothy Michael Murphy added to party XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.(pty:dft) by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc..(Murphy, Timothy) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Secured Tents, LLC. Coyote Logistics LLC served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/22/2023; XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Duvall, Jody) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 27 January 2023. For good cause shown, the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #6 is granted. Defendant Coyote Logistics LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 22, 2023. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr on behalf of Coyote Logistics LLCAttorney Bobby Glendon Riley, Jr added to party Coyote Logistics LLC(pty:dft) (Riley, Bobby) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Coyote Logistics LLC. Coyote Logistics LLC answer due 2/22/2023. (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 January 2023. Consent Form due by 3/30/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/5/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (blaws) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (blaws) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Coyote Logistics LLC, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8870915)Attorney Jody Nicholas Duvall added to party Secured Tents LLC dba Flexx Productions(pty:pla), filed by Secured Tents LLC dba Flexx Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons for XPO, #9 Summons for Coyote)(Duvall, Jody) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less