This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:03:37 (UTC).

Secundino v. Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Secundino filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven M. Gold and Eric N. Vitaliano. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06870

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven M. Gold

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Octavio Secundino

Defendants

Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC

Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc.

Ngawang Jamdol

Lobsang Gawa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Giustino Cilenti

Attorney at Cilenti & Cooper, PLLC

10 Grand Central, 155 East 44Th Street, Ste 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Jian Hang

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 10G

Flushing, NY 11354

Qinyu Fan

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-20 38Th Ave, Ste 10G

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jian Hang on behalf of Ngawang Jamdol, Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc., Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC (aty to be noticed) (Hang, Jian) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc., Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC, Ngawang Jamdol. Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Ngawang Jamdol waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Fan, Qinyu) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Qinyu Fan on behalf of Ngawang Jamdol, Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc., Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC (aty to be noticed) (Fan, Qinyu) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lobsang Gawa, Ngawang Jamdol, Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc., Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12131846 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Octavio Secundino. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cilenti, Giustino) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jian Hang on behalf of Ngawang Jamdol, Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc., Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC (aty to be noticed) (Hang, Jian) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc., Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC, Ngawang Jamdol. Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Ngawang Jamdol waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Fan, Qinyu) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Qinyu Fan on behalf of Ngawang Jamdol, Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc., Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC (aty to be noticed) (Fan, Qinyu) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lobsang Gawa, Ngawang Jamdol, Tibetan Japanese Restaurant Inc., Tibetan Japanese Restaurant NY LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12131846 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Octavio Secundino. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cilenti, Giustino) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less